Ploof #194745 v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Michael Ploof
Defendant: Charles L Ryan and Matthew A Musson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00946
Filed: May 7, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2016 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 241 ). Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 241 ) is granted, and the action is terminated with prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/2/16. (EJA)
December 23, 2014 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's "Motion for Emergency Mandatory Preliminary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order, Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(A)(2)(3)" (Doc. 89 ). (2) Plaintiff's "Motion for Emergency Mandatory Preliminary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order, Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(A)(2)(3)" (Doc. 89 ) is denied. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/23/14. (LAD)
December 10, 2014 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 125 Order - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 144 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must appear for and participate in good faith in his deposition once rescheduled and properly noticed, as required by the Court's October 2, 2014 Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for an Enlargement of the Discovery Deadline (Doc. 165 ) is granted. The parties shall have until February 9, 2015 to complete discovery. (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 12/10/14. (LAD)
July 28, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 30 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 62 ) is withdrawn. (2) Plaint iff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 30 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 62 ) are denied, including his requests for oral argument. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/28/14. (LAD)
June 11, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) - Defendants' Motion for a Screening Order (Doc. 68 ) is GRANTED. (2) Defendants Ryan, Musson, and Pratt must answer the Second Amended Complaint. (3) The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff this Order, and a copy of the Marshal's Process Receipt & Return form (USM-285) and Notice of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service of Summons form for Defendants Ryan, Musson, and Pratt. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/11/14. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ploof #194745 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Michael Ploof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Lucy Marie Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A Musson
Represented By: Lucy Marie Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?