Red Equipment Pte Limited v. BSE Tech LLC et al

Plaintiff: Red Equipment Pte Limited
Defendant: BSE Tech LLC and Boston Semi Equipment LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv01003
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2016 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Red Equipment's motion for summary judgment 120 is granted. BSE' counterclaims are dismissed. Red Equipment's motion in limine 131 is granted. John Kleman is precluded from testifying in this matter. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions 126 is denied. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 3/23/2016.(KMG)
September 18, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Rooker and Lone Star's Motion to Dismiss, going forward, Rooker and Lone Star will be re-designated in the caption of this case as counterdefendants, rather than third-party defendants. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 9/18/14.(LSP)
June 6, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Red Equipment's motion 26 to dismiss Counts III and IV of BSE's counterclaim is granted. Counts III and IV of BSE's counterclaim are dismissed with prejudice. Red Equipment's request for attorney's fees is denied as premature. The issue of attorney's fees will be taken up when this case is fully resolved. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 6/6/2014.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Equipment Pte Limited v. BSE Tech LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSE Tech LLC
Represented By: Philip M Giordano
Represented By: Calvin L Raup
Represented By: David J Schachner
Represented By: Stephen E Traverse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Semi Equipment LLC
Represented By: Philip M Giordano
Represented By: Calvin L Raup
Represented By: David J Schachner
Represented By: Stephen E Traverse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Equipment Pte Limited
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Brophy
Represented By: Julianne C Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?