Gagan v. Monroe et al

Plaintiff: James Gagan
Defendant: Turtle Communications Incorporated, Adam Salene, Kimberly Sullivan, Diane A Mathis, Terry J Mathis, Lajunta E Daniels, W Lance Webb, James A Monroe and Latekidi Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv01113
Filed: May 31, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ORDERED denying Defendant James Monroe's Motion/Request for Evidentiary Hearing/Oral Argument (Doc. 515 in CV 99-01427-PHX-RCB). FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Joinder in Defendant Monroe's Motion/Request for Oral Argument and Motion for Expedited Hearing (Doc. 517 in CV 99-01427-PHX-RCB) (See attached Order for details.) Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/6/2014.(TLB)
December 10, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Because defendant Monroe has already received the relief which he is seeking in his motion for an extension of time to file an answer (Doc. 18) and in his motion for a stay (Doc. 29), those two motions are moot. Accordingly, ORDERED denying 18 Monroe's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and 29 Monroe's Motion to Stay (See attached Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/9/2013.(TLB)
December 9, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER "Defendant James Monroe's Rule 42 Motion to Transfer; Motion to Suspend Deadlines and Motion for a Protective Order" (Doc. 20 in No. CV-13-1113-PHX SRB) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the Clerk of the Court shall trans fer No. CV-13-1113 to this Court; and all future filings relating thereto shall reflect the new case number of CV-13-1113-PHX-RCB; and the Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this order in CV-99-01427-PHX-RCB. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/6/2013. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gagan v. Monroe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Communications Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Salene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane A Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry J Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lajunta E Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Lance Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latekidi Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gagan
Represented By: David Geoffrey Bray(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?