Newsome v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Eliss Newsome
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections, Unknown Party and State Board of Correction
Case Number: 2:2013cv01187
Filed: June 12, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 14 Motion is granted to the extent Plaintiff seeks to clarify the basis for the claims raised in his Second Amended Complaint. The Motion is denied in any other respect. Plaintiff's 15 Second Amended Compl aint and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The docket shall reflect the Court certifies that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/2/2015.(LFIG)
October 27, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the 11 First Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk o f Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/27/2014. (LFIG)
January 30, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Thomas Eliss Newsome. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/27/14. (LSP)
August 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees or file a complete Applic ation to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/12/2013. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newsome v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Eliss Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Board of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?