Wichansky v. Zowine et al

Plaintiff: Marc A Wichansky
Defendant: David T Zowine, Karina Zowine, Martha Leon, Unknown Leon, Charles Johnson, Unknown Johnson, Patricia Gonzalez, Unknown Gonzalez, Pat Shanahan, Unknown Shanahan, Sarah Shanahan, Unknown Spouse Shanahan, Mike Ilardo, Unknown Ilardo, Rio Mayo, Unknown Mayo, Michael Narducci, Unknown Narducci, Brett Costello, Unknown Costello, Zoel Holding Company Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2013cv01208
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2016 567 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 566 . See order for additional details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/30/2016.(DGC, nvo)
June 16, 2016 551 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 542 Motion to Stay. See order for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/2016.(DGC, nvo)
June 1, 2016 534 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 525 Defendants' motion to defer entry of judgment. The Court will enter judgment in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/1/16.(LSP)
May 18, 2016 524 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re additional briefing required re form of judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/18/2016. (DGC, nvo)
April 19, 2016 481 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re the parties joint proposed jury instructions. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/19/2016. (DGC, nvo)
April 1, 2016 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: granting in part and denying in part 336 Seventh MOTION in Limine re: DAMAGES EVIDENCE filed by Charles Johnson, Michael Narducci, Zoel Holding Company Incorporated, Kai Knowlton, Brett Costello, Martha Leon, Justin Grant, Alisa Ilardo, MGA Home Healthcare LLC, Mike Ilardo, Patricia Gonzalez, Sarah Shanahan, Pat Shanahan, Don Maniccia, David T Zowine, Andrea Costello, Karina Zowine, Rio Mayo. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/1/2016. (DGC, nvo)
March 22, 2016 394 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 319 Motion for Sanctions; denying 322 Motion in Limine; denying 323 Motion in Limine; denying 324 Motion in Limine; granting 325 Motion in Limine; granting 326 Motion in Limine; denying 327 Motion in Limine; denying 328 Motion in Limine; denying 329 Motion in Limine; denying 330 Motion in Limine; denying 331 Motion in Limine; denying 332 Motion in Limine; granting 333 Motion in Limine; denying 334 Motion in Limine; granting provisionally 335 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 336 Motion in Limine; granting 337 Motion in Limine; denying 375 Motion for Sanctions; granting 264 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/22/2016.(DGC, nvo)
January 13, 2016 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 314 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/13/2016.(DGC, nvo)
December 11, 2015 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 263 Motion in Limine; denying 273 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 275 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/11/2015.(DGC, nvo)
October 27, 2015 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 279 Report - Other filed by Charles Johnson, Michael Narducci, Zoel Holding Company Incorporated, Kai Knowlton, Brett Costello, Martha Leon, Justin Grant, Alisa Ilardo, MGA Home Healthcare LLC, Mike Ilardo, Patricia Gonzale z, Sarah Shanahan, Pat Shanahan, Don Maniccia, David T Zowine, Andrea Costello, Karina Zowine, Rio Mayo, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to 279 Report - Other, 263 First MOTION in Limine re: Evidence of Initmidation and Manipulation, 264 Second MOTION in Limine re: Elizabeth Hogue Expert Report: Responses due 11/16/2015. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/27/2015. (DGC, nvo)
September 29, 2015 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 251 Brief (Non Appeal) filed by Charles Johnson, Michael Narducci, Zoel Holding Company Incorporated, Kai Knowlton, Brett Costello, Martha Leon, Justin Grant, Alisa Ilardo, MGA Home Healthcare LLC, Mike Ilardo, Patricia Gonzalez, Sarah Shanahan, Pat Shanahan, Don Maniccia, David T Zowine, Andrea Costello, Karina Zowine, Rio Mayo, 252 Memorandum filed by Marc A Wichansky. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/29/2015. (DGC, nvo)
June 15, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/15/2015.(DGC, nvo)
November 4, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/2014.(DGC, nvo)
January 24, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 2/7/2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/24/2014.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wichansky v. Zowine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc A Wichansky
Represented By: Sean R Callagy(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Matthew R Major(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael J Smikun(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T Zowine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karina Zowine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ilardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ilardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoel Holding Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?