Qualls v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: William Kenneth Qualls
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2013cv01288
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2017 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 157 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and denying 159 Motion for Relief from Judgment. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED a certificate of appealability as to the September 7, 2017 motion for relief from judgment is denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/18/17.(LSP)
December 13, 2016 152 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED. Probable cause does not exist for the appeal. Applicant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right; in forma pauperis status denied as to this appeal re: 151 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/13/16. (LSP)
October 31, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's motion to exceed pages (Doc. 148 ) is granted to the extent that the Clerk of the Court shall deem filed the Motion currently lodged at Doc. 149 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Relief from Judgment (Doc. 149 ) is denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/31/16.(KGM)
May 8, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 133 Report and Recommendation, the objections (Doc. 140 ) are overruled; the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 2 ) is DENIED and the Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal, with prejudice. Petitioner's Application f or Certificate of Appealability from the District Court and Statement of Reasons in Support (Doc. 138 ) is DENIED; in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court denies issuance of a certificate of appealability because denial of the petition is based on a plain procedural bar and jurists of reason would not find this Courts procedural ruling debatable. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/8/15. (LSP)
April 21, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 130 Motion for Reconsideration; denying as moot 134 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 135 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk shall file the objections lodged at (Doc. 136 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 137 Motion for exemption from compliance with court rules and extension of page limit. Respondents may file a response to the objections within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/21/15.(LSP)
December 17, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's "Objection to Magistrate Duncan's Order (10/27/14) and Motion for Reconsideration Complaint Request for Investigation," (Doc. 123 ) is overruled and denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/17/14. (LSP)
July 24, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to file an oversized brief. Petitioner's Petition for Habeas Corpus (originally attached to Doc. 1 ) and this case are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this ca se. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. See Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/23/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qualls v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Kenneth Qualls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?