Husband v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Sean Patrick Husband
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2013cv01320
Filed: July 1, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 90 is accepted; Petitioner's habeas petition shall be amended, as requested by Petitioner's counsel ( 89 at 5), to include IAAC and ineffect ive assistance of PCR counsel claims; Martinez v. Ryan, 132 S. Ct. 1309 (2012), is applicable to excuse Petitioner's procedural defaults of his IAAC claim and his irreconcilable conflict claim in Grounds One and Six of his Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 15 ; setting a hearing on 11/22/16 at 1:30 p.m., for four hours to allow Petitioner the opportunity to establish cause and prejudice for the procedural defaults. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/30/16. (REW)
May 28, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court *VACATED by Doc. 58 --ORDER ADOPTING 41 Magistrate Judge Aspey's Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1 ) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are denied. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/28/15. (KGM) Modified on 5/28/2015 (SJF).
April 16, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Magistrate Judge Aspey's Report and Recommendation 41 is accepted; Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is dismissed; the Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/16/15. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Husband v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sean Patrick Husband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?