Freitas v. Thomas et al

Plaintiff: Melvin De Freitas, Jr.
Defendant: Todd Thomas, Ben Griego, Norman Carrier, Manuel Ramero, Carla Robertson, Roy Summerland, David Hinnegar, Nicholas Pastella, Miguel Munguia, Jesus Guilin and Steven Williamson
Case Number: 2:2013cv01364
Filed: July 8, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2016 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 107 ), Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 (Doc. 104 ), and Plaintiff's requests for injunctive relief (D oc. 101 ; Doc. 184 ; Doc. 186 ). The Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 167 ) is adopted as the order of this Court; Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 (Doc. 104 ) is denied. Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief contained in Doc. 101 is denied. Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief contained in Doc. 184 and Doc. 186 is denied. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 107 ) is granted and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/08/2016. (REK)
May 27, 2016 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 140 "Notice of Service for Permission to Amend Freitas Second Set of Supplemental Disclosure Statement Present to Court Order 137 and LRCiv 5.2 PLUS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE". FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to seal and strike Plaintiff's Notice 140 . FURTHER ORDERED that by 6/16/16, Plaintiff shall comply with LRCiv 5.2 by filing a Notice of Service indicating that on 2/18/16, he served his Amended Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement on Defen dants. The Notice of Service shall not attach the Disclosure Statement. FURTHER ORDERED denying 141 "Notice of Service for Permission to File this Motion to Strike...", docketed as a "Motion to Strike." FURTHER ORDERED dir ecting the Clerk of Court to amend the docket to reflect that Plaintiffs Motion to Notify the Court that Plaintiff is Going on a Hunger Strike Hunger Strike as of March 9, 2016 (Doc. 146) is a notice. The Court takes no action on Plaintiffs Notice. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to remove Plaintiffs Notice 146 from the Court's pending motions calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/26/16.(MAP)
January 26, 2016 137 Opinion or Order of the Court * ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Defendants "Motion to Strike and Remove from the Docket Plaintiff's Second Set of Supplemental Disclosure Statement Plus 304 to 374 Production of Documents" on Defendants. The Clerk of Court is directe d to seal Plaintiff's "Second Set of Supplemental Disclosure Statement Plus 304 to 374 Production of Documents" (Doc. 110). The Clerk of Court is further directed to strike Plaintiff's "Second Set of Supplemental Disclosu re Statement Plus 304 to 374 Production of Documents" (Doc. 110 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiff"s "Notice of Service for Permission to Amend Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions [Doc # [11 6]] Affidavit of Kalima Smith" (Doc. 124 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendants' "Motion to Strike and Remove from the Docket Plaintiff's Notice of Service for Permission to Amend Plaintiff's Response to Defendan ts' Motion for Sanctions [Doc 116 -1] Affidavit of Kalima Smith" (Doc. 127 ). (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/26/16. (LAD) * Modified to add additional text on 1/26/2016 (LAD).
October 28, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Plaintiff's "Motion of Witnesses [sic] Declarations and New Evidence". IT IS FURTHER ORDERED deeming Plaintiff's "Motion [to] Notify the Court of Retaliation Done to Inmate Witness by the CCA Legal Team a nd Ben Griego" (Doc. 91 ) to be a request for injunctive relief. The Motion is referred to the District Court Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 99 Defendants' "Motion to Strike Character Witness Declaration (Doc. 98 )" . The Clerk shall strike the Character Witness Declaration (Doc. 98 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 101 Plaintiff's "Motion to Complete and Clarify the Record Regarding the False Declaration of Inmate Kawika Vinano and Plaintiff Stil l Not Allowed to Borrow the Fed. R. Civ. P. Book" and denying 102 Plaintiff's "Motion [for] Service of Subpoenas". IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by November 30, 2015, Plaintiff shall show cause as to why the Court should not grant 104 Defendant's "Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11". Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 10/27/15.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitas v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin De Freitas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Griego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Ramero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Summerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hinnegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pastella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Munguia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Guilin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?