Hopson v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Brian Odell Hopson
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2013cv01396
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Petitioner's "Motion to Supplement (Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation)" (Doc. 59 ) is DENIED. ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Willett's Report and Recommend ation (Doc. 50 ) is accepted and adopted as the Order of this Court. Petitioner's Objections (Doc. 53 ) are overruled. ORDERED that Petitioner's Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (Doc. [ 28]) is DENIED. ORDERED that Petitioner's "(Motion for Summary Judgment) Related to Relief on (Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation)" (Doc. 55 ) is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 11( a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, a Certificate of Appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are denied because dismissal of the Petition is justified by a plain procedural bar and jurists of reason would not find the procedural ruling debatable. Clerk of the Court shall terminate this action and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/12/16. (EJA)
May 7, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER (re: 10 Order) That the April 22, 2014 Order is Amended as follows: Ground One of the Amended Petition is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants must answer Ground Two of the Amended Petition. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/7/14. (MAP)
November 4, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Petitioner's July 11, 2013 Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 1 ) is denied. The Clerk of Court must file the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Memorandum in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with the filing date of A ugust 12, 2013. Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 3 ) is granted. The Petition is dismissed with leave to amend; Petitioner has 30 days from the date this Order is signed to file an amended petition on a court-approved form. The Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice, without further notice to Petitioner, if Petitioner fails to file an amended petition within 30 days from the date this Order is signed. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Odell Hopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?