Miller et al v. York Risk Services Group

Plaintiff: Laurie Miller, Brian Dimas, Anthony Soza, Bruce Campbell, Kellie Bowers, Tim Hunter, Michael Schamadan and Brian Saylor
Defendant: York Risk Services Group
Case Number: 2:2013cv01419
Filed: July 15, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2015 639 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 554 Motion for Protective Order; granting 557 Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiffs' motion at docket 607 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant is directed to produce an unredacted version of the email disc ussing Eileen Saige's performance as directed in this order. Defendant is also directed to produce any emails related to Plaintiffs' workers compensation claims from the following employees: Eileen Price, Pat Sampson, Lesia Fejarang, Jane Benge, and Sandra Gonzales. The motion is otherwise denied. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/3/15.(SJF)
September 25, 2014 413 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 388 Motion to Stay, but nevertheless the court hereby STAYS further proceedings in this court for 10 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/24/14.(LSP)
September 3, 2014 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting 307 Sealed Motion to Compel as follows: Within 14 days, York shall produce all the materials responsive to Request for Production #1 which have not been previously produced, and if previously produced documents were redacted, they shall be produced again without the redactions. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/3/14. (LAD)
August 27, 2014 359 Opinion or Order of the Court *ORDER AND OPINION granting/denying in part 271 Motion to Compel and 291 Sealed Motion to Compel. ORDERED that the following plaintiffs are required to participate in an Independent Medical Examination or an Independent Psychological Examination as follows: See Order for Full Details. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/27/14.(MAP) *Modified on 8/27/2014 to Correct Text (MAP)*.
August 19, 2014 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 256 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall respond to Request for Production 15 within 14 days from the date of this order, to the extent they possess responsive documents; and defendants need not respond to Requests for Production 13 and 14. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/19/14.(JWS)
June 25, 2014 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint in which Klages is added as a plaintiff and Avizent is added as a defendant. The amended complaint may include a claim for IIED for plaintiff Michael Schamadan, but it may not include an IIED claim for any of the other Plaintiffs. The amended complaint shall be filed within seven days from the date of this order, and an answer shall be filed within seven days from the date the amended complaint is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if necessary, with respect to plaintiff Klages only, Defendant may take five depositions, propound twelve interrogatories, and make six more requests for admission than otherwise authorized by the Planning and Scheduling Order at docket 25. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/25/14.(JWS)
April 15, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion to Compel. See PDF for details. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 4/15/14.(JWS)
March 11, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Protective Order. Counsel shall prepare and file a Final Protective Order consistent with the decision in this Order and Opinion. The Final Protective Order will supercede the existing temporary protective order put in place by the order at docket 51. See PDF document. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/11/14.(JWS)
December 19, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, see PDF document for details. Mr. Shamadan's request to be permitted to seek leave to amend is GRANTED. An amended complaint containing Mr. Shamadan's amended claims shall be filed within 14 days from the date of this order. Defendant shall respond within 14 days from the date the amended complaint is filed. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/19/13.(LSP)
December 9, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY ORDER re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint]. The purpose of the order is to assist the parties in preparing for oral argument on the motion. To the extent the complaint seeks r ecovery for Mrs. Schamadans pain and suffering as a result of Defendants alleged aiding and abetting that portion of the complaint is dismissed, because under Arizona law claims to recover damages for pain and suffering do not survive the death of the person injured. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/9/13. (JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. York Risk Services Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Risk Services Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Miller
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin B Wein(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Dimas
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin B Wein(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Soza
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin B Wein(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Campbell
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin B Wein(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Bowers
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin B Wein(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Hunter
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin B Wein(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schamadan
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin B Wein(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Saylor
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin B Wein(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?