Marroquin v. McDonald et al

Plaintiff: Armando Antonio Marroquin
Defendant: Jim McDonald, Jennifer Ward, Jack R Hudson, Unknown Wilkinson, Audrey Partain, Yolanda Fernandez-Carr, Kyle Prince, R Wilson, Unknown Minnieweather, R Williams and J Vasquez
Case Number: 2:2013cv01761
Filed: August 27, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to this action; Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate the Court's June 19, 2014 Order 30 is denied; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 34 is granted; Plaintiff's Cross-M otion for Summary Judgment 42 is denied; Plaintiff's claims in Count Seven are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust; Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate the Court's September 12, 2014 Order 44 is denied; Plaintiff's Mot ion for an Order to Show, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction 43 is denied; Defendants' Motion to Stay Dispositive Motion Deadline 55 is denied as moot; because no claim remains, this action is dismissed and the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/30/15. (REW)
September 12, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Wilkinson are dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/11/14. (REW)
June 19, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss is granted; Counts Two and Three against Ward and Hudson are dismissed as time-barred. Ward and Hudson are dismissed from this action. The remaining claims are Count Four against Wilkinson and Count Seven against Fernundez-Carr and Prince. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/19/2014.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marroquin v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Antonio Marroquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Partain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Fernandez-Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Minnieweather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?