Labertew et al v. Auzenne et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer McDermott, John McDermott and Marcus Labertew
Defendant: Loral Langemeier
Garnishee: 21st Century North America Insurance Company, Chartis Property Casualty Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 2:2013cv01785
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice to re-filing upon resolution of Plaintiff's appeal 28 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/9/2014.(DGC, nvo)
April 7, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Magistrate Judge Michelle Burns' R&R (Doc. 20 ) is accepted. Defendants' Motion for Terminating Non-Parties and/or for Substitution of Real Party in Interest (Doc. 23 ) is denied as moot. The Court will enter Garnishees' proposed judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/7/2014. (KMG)
January 22, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that Garnishees' Notice of Lodging Judgment Pursuant to §12-1581(A), (Doc. 9 ), be granted, and that judgment be entered discharging the Garnishees. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 1/22/14. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labertew et al v. Auzenne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: 21st Century North America Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven G Mesaros(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Randy Lee Kingery(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Chartis Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Steven G Mesaros(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Randy Lee Kingery(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Randy Lee Kingery(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Steven G Mesaros(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loral Langemeier
Represented By: Kathi Mann Sandweiss(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nathan David Meyer(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michelle Catherine Lombino(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roger L Cohen(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Ames(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer McDermott
Represented By: Dona Ann Nutini(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Philip Jeffrey Nathanson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McDermott
Represented By: Dona Ann Nutini(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Philip Jeffrey Nathanson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Labertew
Represented By: Dona Ann Nutini(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Philip Jeffrey Nathanson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?