Quiroz v. Phoenix Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Delano Danny Quiroz, Jr.
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department and Russel Frederiksen
Case Number: 2:2013cv01876
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 16 - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 9 ) is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/1/14. (LAD)
June 11, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) - Count Two is dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Frederiksen must answer Count One of the Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 9 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Frederiksen. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/11/14. (LAD)
February 12, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) The First Amended Complaint (Doc. 7 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. (2) If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/12/14. (LAD)
November 4, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2 ) is granted. The Complaint (Doc. 1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroz v. Phoenix Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russel Frederiksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delano Danny Quiroz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?