Braxton v. Arizona, State of

Petitioner: Chad Everett Braxton
Respondent: Arizona, State of
Case Number: 2:2013cv01916
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Adopting Magistrate Judge Bade's 33 R&R in its entirety and incorporating same into this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the 22 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 and dismissin g this matter with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying a Certificate of Appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in this matter because the dismissal of the instant Petition is justified by a plain procedural bar and jurists of reason would not find the procedural ruling debatable. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 08/31/2015. (ATD)
June 10, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Petitioner's postcard, which the Court construes as a Motion to Re-Open (Doc. 14 ), is granted. The Clerk of Court must vacate the March 28, 2014 Judgment and reopen this case. Petitioner has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to file a second amended petition in compliance with the February 12, 2014 Order. Petitioner must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is the "Second Amended Petition." If Petitioner fails to file a second amended petition within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/10/14. (LAD)
February 12, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) The Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (Non-Death Penalty) (Doc. 8 ) is dismissed for failure to allege the particular federal constitutional right violated in each gro und. Petitioner has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to file a second amended petition in compliance with this Order. Petitioner must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is the "Second Amended Petition." (2) If Petitioner fails to file a second amended petition within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/12/14. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braxton v. Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chad Everett Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?