Liberty West Regional Center LLC v. Carpanzano et al

Plaintiff: Liberty West Regional Center LLC
Defendant: Unknown Chamoun, Nadim Chamoun, Samba Financial Group Escrow & Consulting Services U.S.A. LLC, Marisa Belcastro Carpanzano, Salvatore Carpanzano, CitiBank NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2013cv02021
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Default Judgment as set forth above. The motion is granted with respect to Plaintiff's request for actual damages, pre-judgment interest, and post judgment interest and denied with resp ect to Plaintiff's requests for treble damages, punitive damages, and attorneys' fees. Pursuant to FRCiv. P. 54(b), the Court finds that there is no just reason for delay and directs that default judgment be entered by the Clerk in favor o f Plaintiff Liberty West Regional Center, LLC and against Defendants Salvatore Carpanzano, Marisa Belcastro Carpanzano, and Samba Financial Group Escrow & Consulting Services U.S.A., LLC in the amount of $2,700,000 plus pre-judgment interest cal culated pursuant to A.R.S. § 44-1201 (B) and beginning on December 10, 2012, and post judgment interest calculated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this order. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/3/14. (LAD)
February 18, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/18/2014.(DGC, nvo)
January 14, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff shall have until 1/31/2014 to refile the motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/14/2014.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty West Regional Center LLC v. Carpanzano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chamoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadim Chamoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samba Financial Group Escrow & Consulting Services U.S.A. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Belcastro Carpanzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Carpanzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank NA
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty West Regional Center LLC
Represented By: Edmund Frederick Richardson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Janet B Hutchison(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?