Feldmeier v. Hauser et al

Plaintiff: Ronald M Feldmeier
Defendant: Unknown Parties, R Williams and P Hauser
Case Number: 2:2013cv02027
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' 22 Motion. Defendants' 22 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted; Plaintiff Feldmeier's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/2014.(LFIG)
May 7, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice to refiling. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/7/2014.(LFIG)
December 30, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): Plaintiff's 7 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff's 3 MOTION to Join State Tort Action and Federal 42 U.S.C. 1983 Action is deni ed. Defendant Unknown Emergency Call Box Staff is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the 1 Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants P. Hause r and R. Williams. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/30/2013. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feldmeier v. Hauser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald M Feldmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?