Mowry #159208 v. Knight et al

Plaintiff: Arron Eugene Mowry
Defendant: Unknown Knight, Unknown Evans and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2013cv02053
Filed: October 8, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial, Alt[e]r or Amend Judg[ ]ment, and or Reopen His Case. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/22/2015.(LMR)
December 8, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 45 ). Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 45) is granted; Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/8/2014.(KMG)
April 22, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss and it is denied without prejudice to refiling as a summary judgment motion. ORDERED that Defendants' 37 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply is denied as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/17/2014.(LFIG)
November 7, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Arron Eugene Mowry. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/6/2013. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mowry #159208 v. Knight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arron Eugene Mowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?