Malone v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Theresa Malone
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2013cv02054
Filed: October 9, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' 37 Stipulation: EAJA fees are hereby awarded to Plaintiff in the amount of Three Thousand One Hundred Twelve Dollars and 76/100 ($3,112.76) subject to the terms of the parties' stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/16/2014. (KMG)
March 25, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Unopposed Motion to Remand to the Social Security Administration. The Commissioners decision denying Plaintiff's claim for disability benefits is hereby REVERSED and this Social Security appeal is REMANDED, pursuant to sent ence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), for further administrative proceedings as set forth herein. See Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292 (1993). On remand, an ALJ must (1) provide the substitute party an opportunity for a hearing; (2) determine whet her the claimant's impairments met or equaled the criteria of listings 1.02A and 1.03, providing sufficient rationale in support of the step three finding; and (3) further evaluate the claimant's mental impairments and reassess the claim ant's residual functional capacity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to enter judgment in accordance with Rule 58, Fed.R.Civ.P., and the parties' briefing schedule is hereby vacated. (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/25/14. (LAD)
December 6, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On or before Wednesday, December 11, 2013, Defendant shall file the administrative record in this case as required by 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Failure to comply with this Order will result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/6/2013. (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Chad Troop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Malone
Represented By: Bill LaTour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?