Phillips v. Salt River Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Brian G Phillips
Defendant: Salt River Casino, Maricopa County Sheriff's Department, Salt River Police Department and United States Bureau of Indian Affairs
Case Number: 2:2013cv02057
Filed: October 9, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's request for IFP status is denied with prejudice. Plaintiff's 13 Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/28/2014. (LFIG)
April 15, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 8 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff may refile his request for IFP status if he files an amended complaint. Plaintiff's 7 Amended Complaint is dismissed wit hout prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until May 16, 2014, to file a second amended complaint. The Clerk shall terminate this action without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/2014. (LFIG)
December 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 5 Request for IFP status is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff may refile his request for IFP status if he files an amended complaint. Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until January 6, 2014, to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/12/2013. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Salt River Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt River Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt River Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Indian Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian G Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?