Ortiz v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: David Ortiz
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, Kelly Thompson, Unknown Parties and Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2013cv02097
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ; denying 106 Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Everette Lee Herndon, Jr. FURTHER ORDERED granting 94 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: Punitive Damages. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/25/2015.(TLB)
January 27, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 Stipulation: re: 94 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Punitive Damages, ORDERED that the deadline for defendant to file the Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment re: Punitive Damages is extended to 2/6/2015. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/27/2015. (TLB)
April 11, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.'s and Kelly Thompson's Motion to Dismiss 29 is granted; Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. and Kelly Thompson are terminated from this action. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/10/2014.(ALS)
December 9, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - In this case, the complaint fails to sufficiently plead jurisdiction. ORDERED that by 12/23/2013, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to thecomplaint properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. FURTHER ORDERED that Unknown Parties (named as XYZ Corporations and John Does 1-26) are dismissed because the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not permit the use of fictitious Defendants. (See attached Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/9/2013. (TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ortiz
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Represented By: Kevin B Wein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Thompson
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?