Gutierrez v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Juana Gutierrez
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2013cv02168
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $5,653.89 under the EAJA ($6,385.64 in fees less $1,081.75, plus $350 for the filing fee). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/20/15.(LSP)
September 12, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/12/2014.(DGC, nvo)
August 25, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case is remanded for further proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/14. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Gutierrez
Represented By: Eric Glenn Slepian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?