Mowry # 159208 v. Balashi et al

Plaintiff: Arron Eugene Mowry
Defendant: Unknown Balashi and Correctional Health Services
Case Number: 2:2013cv02210
Filed: October 29, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 48 ; all other matters must remain referred to the Magistrate Judge for disposition as appropriate; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 48 is denied; Defendant Steinhauser must file an Answer within 10 days. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/1/15.(REW)
July 17, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Balashi 31 , Defendant's Stipulation and Motion to Dismiss 35 , and Defendant's Motion for Clarification 45 and the motions are denied as moot; consistent with Magistrate Judge Aspey's 7/7/14 Order, Balashi is dismissed from this action. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/10/14. (REW)
December 12, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Arron Eugene Mowry. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/12/13. (REW)
November 18, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 6 is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees or file a complete Applicati on to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay or file a complete Application within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/18/2013. (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mowry # 159208 v. Balashi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arron Eugene Mowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Balashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?