Torres v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Jose Carlos Guerrero Torres
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2013cv02300
Filed: November 11, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Commissioner's disability determination is aggirmed; the Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Commissioner and against Plaintiff and to terminate this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 4/29/15. (REW)
July 30, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed with Claim 20 is denied; the Court extends the time to properly serve the Commissioner with process from March 17, 2014, nunc pro tunc, to August 15, 2014; Plaintiff's failure to properly serve the Commissioner by 8/15/14 will result in the dismissal of this appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/30/14. (REW)
June 13, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's request for an Extension of Service of Process 16 is granted; Plaintiff's time to properly serve the Commissioner with process is hereby extended, nunc pro tunc, to March 17, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/13/14.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Carlos Guerrero Torres
Represented By: Dustin Paul Vidrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?