Williams v. Arizona, State of et al

Plaintiff: Javon Tamar Williams
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury, Arizona, State of, United States Securities and Exchange Commission and NATO
Case Number: 2:2013cv02306
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Expert is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/28/2014.(TLB)
February 24, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Re-Open Case. FURTHER ORDERED denying the following motions filed by plaintiff: 21 , 22 , 24 , 27 , 28 , 29 , 30 , 35 , 36 , 37 , 41 , 42 , 43 . 44 , 46 , 47 , 48 , 49 and 50 . See attached Order for details. The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/24/2014.(TLB)
January 13, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Complaint and this action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk must enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 2 Application/Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and denying as moot 6 Motion to Seal Exhibit. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/13/14.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javon Tamar Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?