Korff v. Phoenix, City of et al
Plaintiff: Lynne Korff
Defendant: Phoenix, City of, Rebecca Tiger, Unknown Tiger, Adam Conklin, Unknown Conklin, Unknown Parties and Phoenix Police Department
Case Number: 2:2013cv02317
Filed: November 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE re: Exhibits: The Court is in possession of non-electronic exhibits. If the filing party fails to retrieve their exhibit(s) within 30 days, it will be destroyed. (MMO)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting #330 Stipulation of Dismissal - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing this case with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk is directed to terminate the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 11/15/18. (LAD)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the request to extend the deadline by which a Stipulation to Dismiss must be filed from October 26, 2018 to November 15, 2018. The Court will dismiss the case with prejudice on November 20, 2018 if a Stipulation to Dismiss or Joint Status Report is not filed by November 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 10/25/18. (MAW)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER - The parties shall file a Stipulation to Dismiss within thirty days of the filing of this Order. The Court will dismiss the case with prejudice on October 31, 2018 if a Stipulation to Dismiss or Joint Status Report is not filed within thirty days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/26/2018. (ATD)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE of Settlement by Rebecca Tiger. (Odegard, Sally)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER - Pursuant to #324 Joint Status Report, it is Ordered vacating Final Pretrial Conference set for October 26, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel shall file an updated Joint Status Report or Notice of Settlement no later than September 26, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/19/18. (MSA)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions (Defendants' Joint) by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #322 Notice of Waiver of Electronic Service filed by Rebecca Tiger. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Jesse Morgan Showalter, counsel for Defendant Rebecca Tiger. (Odegard, Sally)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 7/3/18. (MSA)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 *ORDER - Affirming the denial of Defendants' #298 Joint Motion for Leave to Respond to Plaintiff's Notice of Appointment of Personal Representative and Plaintiff's Amended/Supplemental Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts. The denial of Defendants' #278 Joint Motion to Quash Expert Subpoenas and Request for Attorneys' Fees is vacated (Doc. 278). Defendants' #278 Joint Motion to Quash Expert Subpoenas and Request for Attorneys Fees is granted in part and denied in part as set forth herein. The subpoenas duces tecum served on Defendants' expert witnesses Michael Kuzel, Charles Huth, Jeff Smith, and Pamela E. Potter, Ph.D. are quashed. The parties are to file a joint status report no later than July 24, 2018. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 7/3/18. Modified on 7/12/2018 to add Judge's signature information(MSA).
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 2/21/2018 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: The Court conducted a Status Conference with all counsel present. The parties may decide to schedule a private mediation, and they are prepared to proceed to a Final Pretrial Conference in 90 days. Defendants request that the Court review Docs. #278 and #298 . A Final Pretrial Conference will be set by separate order to follow. APPEARANCES: Luis Guerra for Plaintiff, Lori Berke for Defendants City of Phoenix and Ofc. Adam Conkin, and Sally Odegard on behalf of Defendant Estate of Craig Tiger. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 1:55 PM to 2:04 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Stipulated Motion to Reset Status Conference (Doc. #317 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED resetting the Status Conference from February 7, 2018 to Wednesday, February 21, 2018 at 2:00 p.m., before U.S. Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett in Courtroom 606, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona. S igned by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/31/18. (MAW)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Joint MOTION Reset Status Conference re: #316 Order, Set/Reset Hearings (Stipulated) by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting a Status Conference in this matter for Wednesday, February 7, 2018 at 2:00 p.m., before U.S. Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett in Courtroom 606, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/26/2018. (REK)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MANDATE of USCA reversing and remanding re: #310 Notice of Appeal filed by Lynne Korff, #313 Notice of Appeal - Amended filed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 NDA) (LAD)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #306 Order, #307 Clerks Judgment by Lynne Korff . (Shapiro, David)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Taxation Judgment. Final Judgment having been entered, costs are taxed as follows. The costs are taxed for the defendant, Estate of Craig Tiger, and against the plaintiff in the amount of $7,203.26. The costs are taxed for the defendants, City of Phoenix and Adam Conklin, and against the plaintiff in the amount of $22,105.78. Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Michael O'Brien on 06/08/2016. (CSL)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 USCA Case Number re: #310 Notice of Appeal. Case number 16-16020, Ninth Circuit. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit.)(KMG)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 *Amended by (Doc. #313 )--NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #304 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Leave to File, #306 Order, #307 Clerks Judgment by Lynne Korff. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-13034806. (Shapiro, David) Modified on 7/7/2016 (KGM).
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 309 BILL OF COSTS by Unknown Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Corbett, Jody)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 BILL OF COSTS by Rebecca Tiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Showalter, Jesse)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 CLERK'S JUDGMENT it is ordered and adjudged that pursuant to the Court's Order filed May 16, 2016, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed. (LSP)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER re: #304 Order; the Clerk shall enter judgment on behalf of Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/16/16. (LSP)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER denying #270 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #267 Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot #278 Defendants' Motion to Quash and #298 Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to Respond. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and terminating the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/5/16.(LSP)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER: denying Plaintiff's "Request for Court Order Regarding Arizona State Board of Pharmacy Controlled Substances Prescription Database Information Regarding Craig Tiger" (Doc. #273 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendant Estate of Tiger's request for sanctions (Doc. #277 ) and denying Plaintiff's motion to strike (Doc. #280 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 03-29-16.(GAR)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #267 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of, Rebecca Tiger. (GAR)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting #290 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk of Court shall file the Reply lodged at (Doc. #291 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's request to file a six page supplemental response to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #294 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 03-29-16.(GAR)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #298 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Appointment of Personal Representative (Doc. 295) and Plaintiff's Amended/Supplemental Response to Defendants' Statement of Fact (Doc. 296) filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 299 RESPONSE to Motion re: #298 MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 *Joint MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Appointment of Personal Representative (Doc. #295 ) and Plaintiff's Amended/Supplemental Response to Defendants' Statement of Fact (Doc. #296 ) re: #296 Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint), #295 Notice (Other) by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody) *Modified to correct event type on 1/8/2016 (KGM).
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #290 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Lynne Korff. Amendment to #285 Statement of Facts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Shapiro, David)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE re: of Appointment of Personal Representative and Ratification by Lynne Korff . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 *RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #290 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David) *Modified to correct event type and document number on 12/22/2015 (KGM).
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 RESPONSE re: #285 Statement of Facts Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Facts by Defendants Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Corbett, Jody)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 *(Filed at Doc. #302 ) - LODGED Proposed Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment re: #290 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody) Modified on 3/29/2016 (GAR).
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 *ORDER granting #288 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing of Replies. Replies in support of the parties' dispositive motions shall be filed by December 21, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 12/17/15. (KGM) *Modified to correct text on 12/17/2015 (KGM).
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 STIPULATION re: #267 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment , #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Filing of Replies by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #278 Joint MOTION to Quash Expert Subpoenas MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE re: of Hand-Delivery by Lynne Korff re: #285 Statement of Facts, #284 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment . (Shapiro, David)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 *AMENDED by (Doc. #296 )--STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #268 Statement of Facts in Response to Defendants' SOF & Supplemental SOF by Plaintiff Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David) Modified on 1/4/2016 (KGM).
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 RESPONSE to Motion re: #267 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #271 Statement of Facts (Controverting) by Defendants Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Corbett, Jody)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 RESPONSE to Motion re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Joint) filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 RESPONSE to Motion re: #278 Joint MOTION to Quash Expert Subpoenas MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #273 MOTION to Compel AZ Pharmacy Controlled Substance Prescription Monitoring Database Information regarding Craig Tiger filed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE of Non-Electronic Filing of Exhibit to Statement of Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 271) by Lynne Korff. (This document, improperly filed in paper, was not entered to the docket at the time of filing on 11/9/15.) (CAD)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Joint MOTION to Quash Expert Subpoenas , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #273 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Defendant Rebecca Tiger. (Showalter, Jesse) *Modified to correct event type and add document number on 11/10/2015 (KGM).
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Disk - 911 Audio Evidence received and stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CAD)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Three disks - Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B, Exhibit 2 to Exhibit D and Exhibit J have been received and are stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CAD)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE re: Non-Electronic Filing of Exhibits by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of re: #268 Statement of Facts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Corbett, Jody)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting Plaintiff's "Motion to File 911 Audio Evidence in Non-Electronic Form" (Doc. #272 ). Plaintiff may file non-electronically the audio-recording referenced on page 3, lines 12-18, in "Plaintiff's Statement of Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. #271 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 10/30/15.(KGM)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting Defendants' "Motion for Leave to File Non-Electronic Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. #269 ). Defendants may file non-electronically the following exhibits to "Defendants' Joint Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. #268 ): Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B - CD containing enhanced audio-recording of Randy Johnsons 911 call; Exhibit 2 to Exhibit D - CD containing the audio interview of Kyle Johnson by Detective Udd; Exhibit J- CD containing audio- recording of radio traffic on June 4, 2012 related to the subject incident. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 10/30/15.(KGM)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MOTION to Compel AZ Pharmacy Controlled Substance Prescription Monitoring Database Information regarding Craig Tiger by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION for Leave to File 911 Audio Evidence In Non- Electronic Form by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 *Joint MOTION for Leave to File Non-Electronic Exhibits re: #268 Statement of Facts in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody) *Modified to correct event type on 10/27/2015 (KGM).
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #267 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #2 Exhibit Exhibits E-H, #3 Exhibit Exhibits I-O, #4 Exhibit Exhibits P-X, #5 Exhibit Exhibits Y-CC)(Corbett, Jody)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #265 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline, Dispositive motions due by 10/26/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 10/21/15. (EJA)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Dispositive Motions - Unopposed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 *NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY re: Notice of Service of Defendant Estate of Craig Tiger's Fifth Supplemental Final Pretrial Disclosure Statement by Rebecca Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified to correct event type on 10/16/2015 (KGM).
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery re Defendant's Fourth Supplemental Final Pretrial Disclosure Statement by Rebecca Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified to correct event type on 9/16/2015 (LSP).
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Deposition of Emil Miller (Second Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting Defendants' request for expedited ruling (Doc. 252); granting Defendants' Joint Motion (Doc. #252 ); and extending the following deadlines: Deadline to take deposition of Emil Miller is September 30, 2015, and deadline for filing dispositive motions is October 21, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/1/2015. (ACL)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 *ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Depose Defendant Conklin about Their Brand New Shooting Story (Doc. #207 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 8/28/15.(KGM) *Modified text on 8/28/2015 (KGM).
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike Rebuttal Expert Opinions of Plaintiff's Experts (Doc. #203 ) and granting Defendants' Request for Leave to Disclose Rebuttal Opinions of Audio Expert (Doc. #203 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 8/28/15.(KGM)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #252 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines for Taking Plaintiff's Audio Expert's Deposition and Filing of Dispositive Motions filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 RESPONSE to Motion re: #252 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines for Taking Plaintiff's Audio Expert's Deposition and Filing of Dispositive Motions filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines for Taking Plaintiff's Audio Expert's Deposition and Filing of Dispositive Motions by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Authorizations Signed by Rebecca Tiger by Rebecca Tiger . (Showalter, Jesse)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Rebecca Tiger . (Showalter, Jesse) *Modified to correct event type on 7/29/2015 (ACL).
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery re Amended Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatory by Rebecca Tiger . (Showalter, Jesse) *Modified to correct event type on 7/14/2015 (LSP).
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 *NOTICE re: Filing Redaction re #194 -1 Motion by Lynne Korff . (Shapiro, David) *Modified text on 7/14/2015 (LSP).
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 REDACTION to #143 Response to Motion by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 REDACTION to #215 Response to Motion by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 REDACTION to #189 Response to Motion by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #242 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Deadline to take deposition of Emil Miller is August 31, 2015. Deadline for filing dispositive motions is September 21, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 7/2/15.(SJF)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting/denying in part #194 Motion to Compel Defendant Tiger's Relevant Medical Records. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Estate of Tiger answer Plaintiff's Interrogatory #1 dated 2/20/15. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Estate of Tiger produce, in response to Plaintiffs Request for Production #1 dated February 20, 2015, signed medical authorizations for Defendant Tigers records from January 1, 2008 through and including June 4, 2012 from the following categories of treating providers: See Order. FURTHER ORDERED denying #233 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. FURTHER ORDERED granting #190 Plaintiff's Motion for the Honorable Court to Determine Whether Portions of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Should Remain under Seal. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court unseal Docs. #190 and #143 . FURTHER ORDERED That the Clerk of Court seal the following exhibits containing the May 18, 2014 report of Holly Judge, M.S., LPC: Docs. [143-1], Doc. [189-1], Doc. [194-1], and Doc. [215-1]. FURTHER ORDERED that by 7/14/15 Plaintiff shall file redacted versions of Doc. [143-1], Doc. [189-1], Doc. [194-1], and Doc. [215-1]. FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part #197 Defendant Craig Tiger's Motion to Seal Documents #189 and #194 . FURTHER ORDERED granting #195 Plaintiff's Motion for the Honorable Court to Determine Whether Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Should Be Filed under Seal. FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part #216 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Response to: Defendant's Motion to Strike Rebuttal Expert Opinions of Plaintiff's Experts, et al. SEE DOCUMENT FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 7/1/15.(MAP)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines for Taking Plaintiff's Audio Expert's Deposition and Filing of Dispositive Motions (Stipulated) by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER Granting #240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - Withdrawing Goldman & Zwillinger PLLC as counsel for Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Luis P. Guerra LLC shall continue as counsel for record for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 06/12/15. (ATD)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Counsel of Record by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Griffiths, Scott)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Remaining Case Deadlines (Doc. #238 ). IT IS ORDERED extending the remaining case deadlines as follows: 1. Deadline for completion of discovery (solely for completion of the depositions of Richard Gregorek, Noelle Herrier, Emil Miller, and the parties' other expert witnesses) to July 1, 2015; 2. Deadline for engaging in good faith settlement talks to July 17, 2015; 3. Deadline for filing dispositive motions to August 21, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 05/29/15. (ATD)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Remaining Case Deadlines (Stipulated) by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Deposition of Former Phoenix Police Chief Daniel Garcia, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE of Deposition of Michael O'Brien (Second Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #228 Stipulation re: #194 MOTION to Compel Defendant Tiger's Relevant Medical Records filed by Lynne Korff. Plaintiffs have until Monday, May 4, 2015 to file their Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/6/15. (SJF)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Reply RE: Motion to Compel and Motion for Leave to File Surreply RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Defendant Rebecca Tiger. (Showalter, Jesse)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #207 MOTION for Discovery Deposition of Defendant Conklin About Their Brand New Shooting Story filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #194 MOTION to Compel Defendant Tiger's Relevant Medical Records filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #203 Joint MOTION to Strike Rebuttal Expert Opinions of Plaintiff's Experts and Request for Leave to Disclose Rebuttal Opinions of Audio Expert filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 STIPULATION re: #194 MOTION to Compel Defendant Tiger's Relevant Medical Records , #214 Response to Motion by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE of Deposition of Richard Gregorek, RNC, filed by Rebecca Tiger. (Odegard, Sally)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Defendant Craig Tiger's Third Supplemental Final Pretrial Disclsoure Statement by Rebecca Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified to correct eventy type on 5/5/2015 (ACL).
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Estate of Craig Tiger's First Supplemental Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Statement by Rebecca Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified to correct event type on 5/5/2015 (ACL).
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of Deposition of Jennifer McCloy, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE of Deposition of Noelle Herrier, NP (First Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Summons Issued as to Rebecca Tiger. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting the Joint Rule 25(a) Motion to Substitute the Estate of Craig Tiger as a Defendant in This Matter (Doc. #211 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED substituting Estate of Craig Tiger by Rebecca Tiger as Personal Representative in place of "Officer Craig Tiger" as a defendant in Korff v.City of Phoenix, et al., 2:13-cv-02317-PHX-ESW. Accordingly, "Officer Craig Tiger" should be removed from the caption in this matter and replaced with "Estate of Craig Tiger by Rebecca Tiger as Personal Representative." Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/30/2015. (ACL)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE re: Acceptance of Service by Craig Tiger . (Showalter, Jesse)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Morgan Showalter on behalf of Craig Tiger. (Showalter, Jesse)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 SUMMONS Submitted by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #207 MOTION for Discovery Deposition of Defendant Conklin About Their Brand New Shooting Story filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6)(Corbett, Jody)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION to Seal Document #215 Response to Motion to Strike by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #203 Joint MOTION to Strike Rebuttal Expert Opinions of Plaintiff's Experts and Request for Leave to Disclose Rebuttal Opinions of Audio Expert filed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David) *Modified on 7/2/201 to Seal Exhibit Pursuant to Order #243 (MAP)*.
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #194 MOTION to Compel Defendant Tiger's Relevant Medical Records filed by Craig Tiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Showalter, Jesse) *Document is not in compliance with L.R. Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 4/20/2015 (ACL).
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 25(a)(3), Fed. R. Civ. P., the #211 Stipulation and Joint Motion must be served on non-parties as provided in Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P. The Court orders that proof of service on the Estate of Craig Tiger by Rebecca Tiger as Personal Representative be filed within 10 business days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/17/2015. (LFIG)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE of Deposition of Hal Korff (First Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION and Joint Rule 25(a) Motion to Substitute the Estate of Craig Tiger by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting the parties' #208 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 6/5/2015. Dispositive motions due by 7/17/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/14/2015. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE of Deposition of Chief Daniel Garcia, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Remaining Case Deadlines (Stipulated) by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION for Discovery Deposition of Defendant Conklin About Their Brand New Shooting Story by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Time Schedule Order Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of Deposition of Christina O'Brien, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE of Deposition of Michael O'Brien (First Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Joint MOTION to Strike Rebuttal Expert Opinions of Plaintiff's Experts and Request for Leave to Disclose Rebuttal Opinions of Audio Expert by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 3 and 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER denying #126 Motion for Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED sealing Doc. #143 , which contains and references a confidential report attached as "Exhibit D." Plaintiff's Motions (Doc #144 and #190 ) are granted. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order (Doc. #160 ) is therefore granted in part to the extent that the document is sealed in this case, and denied in part as to all other requests. (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/1/15.(LAD)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of Deposition of Ryan Eaton, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE of Deposition of Kenneth Porter, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting Defendants' #150 Motion. The depositions of Michael O'Brien and Christina O'Brien shall proceed at the Federal Courthouse where all persons shall be screened at security. A Deputy Marshal shall be available. Counsel shall initiate a joint conference call to the Court's Judicial Assistant with several mutually agreed-upon afternoon dates to schedule a time convenient to the Court's docket so the courtroom will be available for use. Counsel are advised that the courtroom is not usually available in the morning. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/1/2015.(LFIG)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting Defendants' #155 Joint Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Deposition Limit. The Court lifts the deposition stay imposed in its #180 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/1/2015.(LFIG)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION to Seal Document 189 and 194 by Craig Tiger. (Showalter, Jesse)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of Deposition of Emil Miller (First Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MOTION to Seal Document #194 MOTION to Compel Defendant Tiger's Relevant Medical Records by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 * MOTION to Compel Defendant Tiger's Relevant Medical Records by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David) *Modified on 7/2/2015 to Seal Exhibit Pursuant to Order #243 (MAP)*.
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #160 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Craig Tiger, Unknown Tiger, Unknown Parties. (Showalter, Jesse) *Modified linkage on 3/30/2015 (LFIG).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER that the #185 Order is affirmed. The #188 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/25/2015.(LFIG)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Errata re: #189 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Lynne Korff.. (Shapiro, David)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 *MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order re: #160 MOTION for Protective Order by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David) * Modified to correct event on 4/2/2015 (LAD). *Modified on 7/2/2015 to Unseal Pursuant to Order #243 (MAP)*.
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #160 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David) *Modified on 7/2/2015 to Seal Exhibit Pursuant to Order #243 (MAP)*.
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 *MOTION for Reconsideration re: #185 Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David) *Modified to correct link on 3/18/2015 (ACL).
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #155 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Ten Deposition Limit and Request for Expedited Ruling filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Corbett, Jody)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Sign and Have Notarized a Next-of-Kin Consent & Release Authorization of Specimen Release for Outside Testing and Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Disclose Pharmacology Expert. See attached.pdf for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/16/2015. (ACL)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 RESPONSE to Motion re: #155 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Ten Deposition Limit and Request for Expedited Ruling filed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Craig Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified event on 3/12/2015 (LFIG).
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 *WITHDRAWAL of Document re #134 Notice of Deposition of Ricahrd Gregorek, RNC by Craig Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified event on 3/12/2015 (LFIG).
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER staying the depositions of persons listed as yet to be deposed in the Defendants' #155 Joint Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Deposition Limit until such time as the Court rules on the Motion, absent agreement of all parties to the contrary. ORDERED the #172 Emergency Request for Hearing or Ruling to Address Scheduling Dispute is granted. The Court denies the request for oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/9/2015.(LFIG)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 *WITHDRAWAL of Document re #137 Notice of Deposition of Michael Sweeney, M.D. by Craig Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified event on 3/11/2015 (LFIG).
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 *WITHDRAWAL of Document re #136 Notice of Deposition of Jacqueline Prynn, M.D. by Craig Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified event on 3/11/2015 (LFIG).
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 *WITHDRAWAL of Document re #135 Notice of Deposition of Gregory Gale, M.D. by Craig Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified event on 3/11/2015 (LFIG).
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #150 MOTION Take Depositions of Michael O'Brien and Christina O'Brien at Federal Courthouse MOTION to Expedite Ruling filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Corbett, Jody)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #172 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Emergency Hearing re: Scheduling Dispute filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 RESPONSE to Motion re: #172 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Emergency Hearing re: Scheduling Dispute filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6)(Corbett, Jody)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Craig Tiger . (Showalter, Jesse) *Modified event on 3/10/2015 (LFIG).
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Emergency Hearing re: Scheduling Dispute by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Craig Tiger's Final Pretrial Disclsoure Statement by Craig Tiger . (Showalter, Jesse)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting Defendants' #159 Motion. Defendants are granted leave to file a Reply in support of their #150 Motion to Take Depositions of Michael O'Brien and Christina O'Brien at Federal Courthouse. The reply shall address Plaintiff's objection to the taking of Michael O'Brien's deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/5/2015.(LFIG)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER the Request to Expedite Ruling is granted. Plaintiff shall file a Response re #155 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Ten Deposition Limit no later than March 12, 2015. Reply shall be filed no later than March 16, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/5/2015. (LFIG)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #110 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Sign and Have Notarized a Next-of-Kin Consent & Release Authorization of Specimen Release for Outside Testing MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline for Defendants to Disclose Pharmacology Expert MOTION to Expedite Ruling filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of, Craig Tiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(LFIG)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting Defendants' #141 Motion. Defendants may exceed the page limitation for a reply. ORDERED the Clerk of the Court shall file Defendants' #142 Lodged Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/5/2015.(LFIG)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Deposition of Emil Miller, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Deposition of Ryan Eaton, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Deposition of Kenneth Porter, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions Joint Report re: Settlement by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #144 MOTION to Seal Document #143 Response to Motion re: Portions of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, MOTION for Protective Order filed by Phoenix, City of, Craig Tiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Showalter, Jesse) *Modified to add motion part/correct document linkage on 3/3/2015 (LFIG).
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION to File Reply in Support of re: #150 MOTION Take Depositions of Michael O'Brien and Christina O'Brien at Federal Courthouse MOTION to Expedite Ruling by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #151 Stipulation. ORDERED withdrawing Plaintiff's #138 Motion to Strike without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/2/2015. (LFIG)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Ten Deposition Limit and Request for Expedited Ruling by Craig Tiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Showalter, Jesse)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #150 MOTION Take Depositions of Michael O'Brien and Christina O'Brien at Federal Courthouse MOTION to Expedite Ruling filed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Transcripts)(Zwillinger, Scott) *Document not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 3/2/2015 (LFIG).
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER the #150 Request for Expedited Ruling is granted. Response, if any, to the #150 MOTION to Take Depositions shall be filed no later than February 27, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 2/20/2015. (LFIG)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Notice of Suggestion of Death of Defendant Craig Tiger and Rule 25(a) Motion for Substitution of Defendant Craig Tiger for his Estate by Craig Tiger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Showalter, Jesse)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION Take Depositions of Michael O'Brien and Christina O'Brien at Federal Courthouse , MOTION to Expedite Ruling by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Morgan Showalter on behalf of Craig Tiger. (Showalter, Jesse)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #126 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Former Police Chief Daniel Garcia filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Corbett, Jody)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order to Prevent: Former Chief Daniel Garcia's Deposition, pending the Courts in camera inspection of documents in dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 2/12/15.(MAP) Modified on 4/2/2015 (SJF).
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION to Seal Document #143 Response to Motion re: Portions of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Shapiro, David)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #126 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Former Police Chief Daniel Garcia filed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-O)(Shapiro, David) *Modified on 2/12/2015 to Seal Document Pursuant to Order #145 (MAP)*. * Modified on 4/2/2015 to Seal per Order #202 (LAD). Modified on 7/2/2015 to Unseal main document, seal exhibit pursuant to Order #243 (MAP)*.
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 FILED @ Doc. #166 LODGED Proposed Reply in Support of Motion for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Sign and Have Notarized a Next-of-Kin Consent & Release Authorization of Specimen Release for Outside Testing and Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Disclose Pharmacology Expert re: #110 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Sign and Have Notarized a Next-of-Kin Consent & Release Authorization of Specimen Release for Outside Testing MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline for Defendants to Disclose Pharmacology Expert MOTION to Expedite Ruling . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-15)(Corbett, Jody) Modified on 3/5/2015 (LFIG).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Sign and Have Notarized a Next-of-Kin Consent & Release Authorization of Specimen Release for Outside Testing and Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Disclose Pharmacology Expert by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #138 MOTION to Strike, MOTION to Substitute Party: Substituting The Estate of Craig Tiger in place of Craig Tiger . (Shapiro, David) *Modified event on 2/10/2015 (LFIG).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 WITHDRAWN by Doc. #158 *MOTION to Strike, MOTION to Substitute Party: Substituting The Estate of Craig Tiger in place of Craig Tiger by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David). *Modified to add motion part on 2/10/2015 (LFIG). Modified on 3/2/2015 (LFIG).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 WITHDRAWN by Doc. #179 NOTICE of Deposition of Michael Sweeney, M.D., filed by Craig Tiger. (Odegard, Sally) Modified on 3/11/2015 (LFIG).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 WITHDRAWN by Doc. #178 NOTICE of Deposition of Jacqueline Prynn, M.D., filed by Craig Tiger. (Odegard, Sally) Modified on 3/11/2015 (LFIG).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 WITHDRAWN by Doc. #177 NOTICE of Deposition of Gregory Gale, M.D., filed by Craig Tiger. (Odegard, Sally) Modified on 3/11/2015 (LFIG).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 WITHDRAWN by Doc. #182 NOTICE of Deposition of Richard Gregorek, RNC, filed by Craig Tiger. (Odegard, Sally) Modified on 3/12/2015 (LFIG).
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Deposition of Jennifer McCloy (Videotaped), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Deposition of Noelle Herrier (Videotaped), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Deposition of Hal Korff (Videotaped), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Deposition of Michael O'Brien (Videotaped), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Deposition of Kenneth Porter, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Former Police Chief Daniel Garcia by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Deposition of Kenneth Porter, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Dispute Hearing Proceedings held on 01/26/2015, before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett. (Transcriber: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2015. (RAP)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #110 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Sign and Have Notarized a Next-of-Kin Consent & Release Authorization of Specimen Release for Outside Testing MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline for Defendants to Disclose Pharmacology Expert MOTION to Expedite Ruling filed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David) *Document not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 2/2/2015 (LFIG).
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of for proceedings held on 01-26-2015, Judge Eileen S. Willett hearing judge(s). (Corbett, Jody)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lynne Korff for proceedings held on 1/26/2015, Judge Eileen Willett hearing judge(s). (Shapiro, David)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Craig Tiger. (Odegard, Sally) *Modified event on 1/29/2015 (LFIG).
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett: Telephonic Conference held on 1/26/2015. Defendants' Motion for Protective Order shall be filed by February 4, 2015. Plaintiff's Response shall be filed by February 11, 2015. Defendants' Reply shall be filed by February 16, 2015. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 2:05 PM to 2:34 PM.(LFIG)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER: Telephone Conference regarding discovery dispute set for 1/26/2015 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 321, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. Counsel for Defendant City of Phoenix shall initiate the conference call. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESW, dm)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying the #110 Motion to Expedite. The #110 Motions shall be considered upon full briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/15/2015.(LFIG)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Craig Tiger. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Craig Tiger. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Tulchinsky, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
January 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Sign and Have Notarized a Next-of-Kin Consent & Release Authorization of Specimen Release for Outside Testing , MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline for Defendants to Disclose Pharmacology Expert , MOTION to Expedite Ruling by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting the #105 Stipulated Motion and extending the deadline for Defendants to disclose their expert witnesses and opinions to January 12, 2015, and extending the deadline for the parties to disclose rebuttal experts to February 13, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/5/2015.(LFIG)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
December 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Expert Disclosure Deadlines (Stipulated) by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Deposition of Daniel Garcia, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Tulchinsky, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Zwillinger, Scott)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Deposition of Sgt. Robert Tulchinsky, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE re: Notice of Suggestion of Death by Craig Tiger . (Odegard, Sally)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Minute Order: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This matter is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett for all further proceedings. All documents filed in this action should bear the initials ESW as part of the complete case number (see revised case number above). All pending deadlines and hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Deposition of Detective Darren Udd, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #88 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. ORDERED extending the remaining deadlines. Discovery due by 4/6/2015. Dispositive motions due by 5/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 10/22/2014. (LFIG)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Remaining Case Deadlines (Stipulated) by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbett, Jody)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Deposition of Officer Matthew Christensen, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Deposition of Detective Raymond Roe, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Deposition of Ryan Eaton, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Deposition of Randy Johnson, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Deposition of Randy Johnson (Third Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoena Duces Tecum by Lynne Korff . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Shapiro, David)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Deposition of Kyle Johnson (Third Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #73 Stipulation. Discovery due by 2/17/2015. Dispositive motions due by 3/17/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 8/8/2014. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Griffiths, Scott)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Deposition of Kyle Johnson (Second Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Deposition of Michelle Fabela (Third Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Deposition of Randy Johnson (Second Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Deposition of Jeff Webbe, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Deposition of Ryan Eaton, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Deposition of Cameron Wells, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Deposition of Matthew Christensen, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Deposition of Detective Hutchinson, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Deposition of Darren Udd, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Deposition of Raymond Roe, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Deposition of Adam Conklin, filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan: Informal Telephone Conference held on 6/18/2014. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order is denied. Hearing held 11:15 AM to 11:25 AM.(LFIG)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Deposition of Michelle Fabela (Second Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Deposition of Lynne Korff (First Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Deposition of Kirsten Hillhouse (First Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Shapiro, David)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Jane Doe Tiger and Jane Doe Conklin, without prejudice. ORDERED that said dismissals apply only to Jane Doe Conklin and Jane Doe Tiger and shall have no effect whatsoever on any of the claims asserted against remaining Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 6/3/2014. (LFIG)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Deposition of Kyle Johnson (First Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Deposition of Michelle Fabela (First Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Deposition of Lynne Korff, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Deposition of Katherine Larkin (First Amended), filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Deposition of Randy Johnson, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Berke, Lori)
May 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Deposition of Kyle Johnson, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
May 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Deposition of Michelle Fabela, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
May 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Deposition of Catherine Larkin, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
May 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Deposition of Kristen Hillhouse, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
May 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Deposition of Randy Johnson, filed by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Amended Initial Rule 26 Disclosure Statement by Craig Tiger . (Odegard, Sally)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lynne Korff. (Griffiths, Scott)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 12/31/2014. Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 5/15/2014. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE re: Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of . (Berke, Lori)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Craig Tiger . (Odegard, Sally)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: This matter having been reassigned to Magistrate Judge David K Duncan, Scheduling Conference set on 4/28/2014 before Judge Susan R Bolton is vacated to be reset by Magistrate Judge Duncan. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge David K Duncan added. Judge Susan R Bolton no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-13-2317-PHX-DKD. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/22/14. (MAP)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Order Dismissing Jane Doe Tiger and Jane Doe Conklin)(Griffiths, Scott)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #27 Defendant Craig Tiger's Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Craig Tiger. Incorrect form used. The proper form to be submitted is AO85, Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction. The form is to be signed by all parties and is not to be e-filed but submitted in paper form with the Clerk's Office. DO NOT REFILE. The deficiency has been addressed by the clerk. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 *NOTICE re: Defendant Craig Tiger's Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge by Craig Tiger . (Odegard, Sally) *Modified on 4/16/2014 to Reflect Incorrect Form Submitted, Attorny Notified. No Further Action at this Time (MAP)*.
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Answer of Defendant City of Phoenix ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Phoenix, City of.(Berke, Lori)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: The Court having ruled on Defendant City of Phoenix's Motion to Dismiss #24 , IT IS ORDERED vacating Oral Argument set on 5/19/2014 at 09:30 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Defendant City of Phoenix's Motion to Dismiss [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/26/14.(MAW)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Continue Hearing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Hearing on Defendant City of Phoenix's Motion to Dismiss #3 set for March 24, 2014, is continued to May 19, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/19/14.(MAW)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant City of Phoenix's Motion to Dismiss by Adam Conklin, Phoenix, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berke, Lori)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Craig Tiger.(Odegard, Sally)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2014 at 01:15 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/6/14. (MAW)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Adam Conklin.(Berke, Lori)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATUS REPORT - Plaintiff's Status Report Pursuant to this Court's Order dated February 6, 2014 by Lynne Korff. (Griffiths, Scott)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 *SERVICE EXECUTED-Amended filed by Lynne Korff: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Officer Adam Conklin on 02-10-2014. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service)(Griffiths, Scott) *Modified to correct service date on 2/13/2014 (LFIG).
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 *SERVICE EXECUTED-Amended filed by Lynne Korff: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Officer Craig Tiger on 02-10-2014. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service)(Griffiths, Scott) *Modified on 2/12/2014 to reflect date of service. (LFIG)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 *SERVICE EXECUTED: Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Craig Tiger on 2/10/2014 by Lynne Korff . (Griffiths, Scott) *Modified to correct event on 2/11/2014 . (LFIG)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: After review of the docket, the Court notes that the complaint is this matter was filed on May 31, 2013, and served on Defendants City of Phoenix and City of Phoenix Police Defendant. Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint on October 25, 2013. Defendant City of Phoenix removed Plaintiff's state court action to this Court on November 13, 2013. The Court cannot tell from the record in this Court if Defendants Officer Craig Tiger, Jane Doe Tiger, Officer Adam Conklin and Jane Doe Conklin were served with the summons and complaint within the time required by Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff file a status report concerning the status of the above-named Defendants within 7 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is notified that this matter will be dismissed as to the above-named Defendants within 7 days if Plaintiff fails to file a status report. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/6/14. (MAW)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2014 at 10:30AM before Judge Susan R Bolton re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Party City of Phoenix . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Party City of Phoenix filed by Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Response and Defendant's Reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the deadline for Plaintiff to file and serve a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to December 27, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Reply to Plaintiff's Response shall be filed and served on or before January 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/2/14.(MAW)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Party City of Phoenix Plaintiffs Response to Defendant City of Phoenix Motion to Dismiss filed by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, David)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *MOTION to Amend/Correct this Court's #8 Order of December 20, 2013 by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Corrected Proposed Order)(Shapiro, David) *Modified to correct event on 12/26/2013 (LFIG).
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the deadline for Plaintiff to file and serve a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #3 to December 19, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's response shall be filed and served by January 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/20/13.(MAW)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Extend Deadlines for Plaintiff's Response and Defendants's Reply to Defendant City of Phoenix's Motion to Dismiss by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Deadlines)(Shapiro, David)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the deadline for Plaintiff to file and serve a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to December 19, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response shall be filed and served on or before January 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/10/13.(MAW)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant City of Phoenix's Motion to Dismiss by Lynne Korff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffiths, Scott)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE re Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge by Lynne Korff re #2 New Case Opened, . (Zwillinger, Scott)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Party City of Phoenix by Phoenix, City of. (Corbett, Jody)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-9821553. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-13-02317-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2013-007843. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number PHX 0970-9821553 filed by Phoenix, City of. (submitted by Jody Corbett) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(REK)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order *****State Court record received on 11/13/2013*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lynne Korff: Certificate of Service re Complaint, Summons, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon City of Phoenix and Phoenix Police Department (via City Clerk) on 9/10/2013.*****Certificate of Service by Private Process Server filed in State Court on 9/12/2013, docketed in U.S. District Court on 11/13/2013 for case management purposes.***** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korff v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Korff
Represented By: David Carey Shapiro
Represented By: Luis Pedro Guerra
Represented By: Scott Andrew Griffiths
Represented By: Scott H Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Jody Campbell Corbett
Represented By: Lori V Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Tiger
Represented By: Sally Ann Odegard
Represented By: Jesse Morgan Showalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Conklin
Represented By: Jody Campbell Corbett
Represented By: Lori V Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department
Represented By: Jody Campbell Corbett
Represented By: Lori V Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?