Nganje v. CVS Rx Services Incorporated

Plaintiff: Annette J Nganje
Defendant: CVS Rx Services Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2013cv02327
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of court shall enter judgment dismissing plaintiff's amended complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 7/10/15.(SJF)
April 23, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant's 21 Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is denied. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 4/23/2014.(LFIG)
February 11, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 8 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's constructive discharge, retaliation, and "equitable relief" claims are dismissed. Defendant's motion is otherwise denied. Plai ntiff is given leave to amend as to her claims for constructive discharge and retaliation. If plaintiff is seeking equitable relief, she should do so in the prayer of her amended complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint, should she choose to file one, shall be filed on or before March 4, 2014. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 2/11/2014.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nganje v. CVS Rx Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette J Nganje
Represented By: Joshua William Carden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Rx Services Incorporated
Represented By: Dinita L James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?