Pruitt v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Sherman Terrell Pruitt
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Wexford Health Sources Incorporated and Corizon Health Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2013cv02357
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 138 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification. Defendant Anderson serve a copy of the Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Facts (Docs. 104 , 105 ) on Plaintiff by mailing a copy of the documents to him at his address of record. Defendant Anderson shall file a Notice of Service contemporaneously thereto. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of service to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 12/2/16.(DXD)
April 7, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Plaintiff's "Motion for Enlargement" and granting Plaintiff's "Motion for Rule 56 and Declaration" (Doc. 62 ). The parties shall file a joint status report by April 27, 2016. Plaintiff's deadli nes for responding to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 52 , 55 , 57 ) are stayed pending further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to amend the docket to reflect that Plaintiff's fil ing on February 18, 2016 is a "Motion for Rule 56 and Declaration," not a response to Defendants Merchant, Ende, Furar, and Thompson's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 52 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 74 Plaintiff 9;s "Motion for Enlargement" and denying 80 Plaintiff's "Motion for the Appointment of Expert Witnesses and Memorandum in Support and Declaration". IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking the following filings from the docket: (Docs. 77 , 78 , and 79 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 04/07/16.(GAR) Modified on 4/7/2016 (GAR).
February 4, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 51 Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, docketed as "Motion to Produce Documents by Sherman Terrell Pruitt." See PDF document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 2/3/16.(LSP)
November 24, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 11/24/15.(KGM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruitt v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Terrell Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?