Camargo v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: Alfredo Camargo
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2013cv02488
Filed: December 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION in part and rejecting in part as discussed herein re: 114 Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's Renewed Second Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is denied with prejudice. Petitioner's Renewed Motion for Expansion of the Record and an Evidentiary Hearing (Doc. 107 ) is denied. Respondent Attorney General of the State of Arizona, who does not have custody of Petitioner Alfredo Camargo, is dismisse d as an improper party in a federal habeas corpus proceeding. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Respondent David Shinn and against Petitioner Alfredo Camargo. The Clerk shall terminate this case. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 8/13/20. (DXD)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ADOPTING 38 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the court's March 9, 2015 order (Doc. 26 ) temporarily vacating its March 4, 2015 order (Doc. 23 ) and the Clerk's Judgment (Doc. 24 ) is vacated. The court's March 4, 2015 order (Doc. 23 ) adopting the Magistrate Judge's initial Report and Recommendation (Doc. 19 ) is reinstated. The Clerk shall enter judgment denying and dismissing Petitioner's First Amended Petit ion for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 6 ). A certificate of appealability is granted on the following questions: (1) whether Petitioner's federal habeas petition should be considered timely under 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d), (2) whether Petitioners Fifth, Sixth, and Fourteenth Amendment rights were violated by the "constructive denial of the right to counsel," and (3) whether Petitioners Fifth, Sixth, and Fourteenth Amendment rights were violated by his PCR counsel's failure to raise the trial court's constructive denial of Petitioner's right to effective assistance of counsel. The certificate of appealability shall not certify any other questions (Ninth Circuit Case Number: 15-15622). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/4/15. (LSP)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ACCEPTING 19 Amended Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability is granted.The Clerk to enter judgment denying and dismissing Petitioners First Amended Petition (Doc. 6 ) with prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/3/2015. (ACL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camargo v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfredo Camargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?