Torrie v. Goodman Law Offices PC et al

Plaintiff: Megan Torrie
Defendant: Goodman Law Offices PC, Clint Goodman and Unknown Goodman
Case Number: 2:2013cv02659
Filed: December 31, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/5/2015.(DGC, nvo)
December 12, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns for purposes of conducting a settlement conference. Counsel for the parties shall jointly call Judge Burns' chambers on or before December 19, 2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/12/14. (LSP)
November 4, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 27 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/2014.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrie v. Goodman Law Offices PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Torrie
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Rachel W Maron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Law Offices PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?