Fuller v. Granville et al

Plaintiff: Samuel Louis Fuller
Defendant: Kari Jill Granville, Unknown Hansdall, Unknown Abbott and Unknown Alger
Case Number: 2:2014cv00020
Filed: January 6, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2016 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that "Plaintiff's § 144 Bia[s] or prejudice of judge/Affidavit"(Doc. 163 ) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/2/16. (KGM)
January 12, 2016 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion with Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 154 is denied; the Clerk must strike Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion with Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 154 ) from the docket in this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/12/16.(REW)
November 10, 2015 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Full Adversary Hearing pursuant to Rule 611(b) Fed R. of Evid. (Doc. 120 ) is denied. The part of Plaintiff's "Intervene, Intervene, Intervene!!! 9/11" (Doc. 126 ), which seeks injunctive relief is denied. "Plaintiff's Request to Conduct Jail House Depositions of a Prisoner" (Doc. 128 ) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/10/15.(SJF)
August 28, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief in his "Renewed Request for Issuance of a Subpoena to Granville: Injunction" 87 ; Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/28/15.(REW)
August 10, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction; Notice of Errata No. 1 (Doc. 54 ), and Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction; Notice of Errata No. 1 is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 08/10/2015. (REK)
September 12, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 is granted; Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order 6 is denied without prejudice; Count One is dismissed without pre judice; Defendants Granville, Abbott, and Alger are dismissed without prejudice; Defendant Hansdall must answer the relevant portion of Count Two; the Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint 1 , this Order, and both summon s and request for waiver forms for Defendant Hansdall; Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 21 days; this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/12/14. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Granville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Louis Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Jill Granville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hansdall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?