Matthews v. Summers

Plaintiff: Moses Isaiah Matthews
Defendant: Heather Summers
Case Number: 2:2014cv00062
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's motion for reconsideration, 75 , is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion to continue the jury trial, (Doc. 75 at 5), is hereby DENIED. [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/23/2016. (KAL)
February 19, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: IT IS ORDERED that on the issue of Plaintiff's exhaustion of available administrative remedies, the Court finds in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a jury trial on Pl aintiff's Eighth Amendment claim against Defendant shall be held on March 15, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will resume the portions of the Final Pretrial Conference relating to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim on March 10, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. [See attached document for details.] Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/19/2016. (KAL)
February 5, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's motion 60 , to modify the Final Pretrial Order 56 , is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file an amended Proposed Final Pretrial Order by Tuesday, February 9, 2016 [see attached Order for further details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/5/2016. (KAL)
July 29, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 17 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents (Doc. 22 ). The Clerk of the Court is ordered to strike Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents (Doc. 20 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 7/29/2014.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Isaiah Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?