Longnecker et al v. American Express Company et al

Plaintiff: Janet Seitz, Bonita Kathol, Jennifer Flynn, Erandi Acevedo and Jonathan Longnecker
Defendant: American Express Company and Amex Card Services Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00069
Filed: January 14, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Certify Class; denying 63 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. The court will conditionally certify a collective action but the proposed class is limited to current and former Phoenix cal l center employees who were hired prior to June 1, 2003 and with a primary job function of handling phone calls with customers, vendors, and the public. The parties shall meet and confer about the notice that should be issued and shall submit a jo intly proposed notice or any disagreements as to same on or before September 2, 2014. On or before September 9, 2014, defendants shall provide Kathol with a list of the names and addresses of all Phoenix call center employees who meet the class definition. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 8/18/14. (LAD)
May 28, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration was granted at oral argument. The clerk shall enter judgment dismissing without prejudice Longnecker's, Acevedo's, Flynn's, and Seitz's claims against defendants. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 5/28/14. (LSP)
April 21, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss is denied as is their Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 4/21/2014.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longnecker et al v. American Express Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Dawn L Dauphine
Represented By: Sharon A Lisitzky
Represented By: William J Maledon
Represented By: Pamela Richardson
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amex Card Services Company
Represented By: Dawn L Dauphine
Represented By: Sharon A Lisitzky
Represented By: William J Maledon
Represented By: Pamela Richardson
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Seitz
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Kaitlyn Alissa Redfield-Ortiz
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Charles P Yezbak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita Kathol
Represented By: Charles P Yezbak, III
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Kaitlyn Alissa Redfield-Ortiz
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Flynn
Represented By: Charles P Yezbak, III
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Kaitlyn Alissa Redfield-Ortiz
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erandi Acevedo
Represented By: Charles P Yezbak, III
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Kaitlyn Alissa Redfield-Ortiz
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Longnecker
Represented By: Charles P Yezbak, III
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Kaitlyn Alissa Redfield-Ortiz
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?