Martin et al v. Medtronic Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Debra Martin and Patrick Martin
Defendant: Medtronic Incorporated and Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2014cv00385
Filed: February 27, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 42 Motion to Dismiss. The clerk of court shall enter judgment dismissing plaintiffs' second amended complaint with prejudice. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 4/1/15.(LAD)
November 24, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss 28 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' motion to strike 27 is denied as moot. The court sua sponte dismisses plaintiffs' first amended complaint in its entirety . Plaintiffs are given leave to amend only as to Debra's fraud claims that are based on defendants' off-label promotion and as to Patricks loss of consortium claim. Plaintiffs' second amended complaint, should they elect to file one, shall be filed on or before December 15, 2014. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 11/21/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS)
July 23, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing; granting 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed. Plaintiffs' amended complaint, if they elect to file one, shall be filed on or before August 13, 2014. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 7/23/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. Medtronic Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Kevin Brown
Represented By: Kathleen Kelly Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Kevin Brown
Represented By: Kathleen Kelly Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Martin
Represented By: Margaret M Branch
Represented By: Turner Williamson Branch
Represented By: Adam T Funk
Represented By: Marlene J Goldenberg
Represented By: Stuart L Goldenberg
Represented By: Deborah S Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Martin
Represented By: Margaret M Branch
Represented By: Turner Williamson Branch
Represented By: Adam T Funk
Represented By: Marlene J Goldenberg
Represented By: Stuart L Goldenberg
Represented By: Deborah S Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?