Benge v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Robert Joseph Benge
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Unknown Ryan, Richard Pratt, Unknown Pratt, Arizona Department of Corrections, Wexford Health Incorporated of Pittsburgh, PA, Corizon Health Sources of Brentwood, TN, Kenneth Merchant, Unknown Merchant, Carey Tucker, Unknown Tucker, C Mahlar and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2014cv00402
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2016 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a status conference will be held in this case on August 18, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. before The Honorable David G. Campbell, Sandra Day O'Connor Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/11/2016. (KMG)
January 5, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants Tucker, Mahler and Corizon's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 64); Defendant Wexford's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 88); Defendant Merchant's motion for su mmary judgment (Doc. 96); Defendants Ryan, Pratt, and Santo's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 119); and Plaintiff's motion to supplement his response to Defendants Tucker, Mahler, and Corizon's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 124). Plaintiff's motion to reopen discovery and file an amended complaint(Doc. 146 ) is denied. Plaintiff's motion to supplement his response to Defendants Tucker, Mahler, and Corizon's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 124 ) is denied. Defendants Tucker, Mahler, and Corizon's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 64 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted as to Defendants Mahler and Corizon and denied as to Defendant Tucker. Defendant Wexford's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 88 ) is granted. Defendant Merchant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 96 ) is denied. Defendants Ryan, Pratt, and Santo's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 119 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The m otion is granted as to Defendants Ryan and Pratt and denied as to Defendant Santo. Corizon, Wexford, Mahler, Ryan, and Pratt are dismissed as Defendants. The remaining claims are Count I against Defendants Santo and Merchant and Count II against Defendant Tucker. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/5/2016.(KMG)
February 24, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff'sMotions "Requesting Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order" (Docs. 12 and 16 ) and Plaintiff's "Motion Requesting Appointment of E xpert Witness to Assist/Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order Hearing" (Doc. 39 ). Plaintiff's Motions "Requesting Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order" (Docs. 12 and 16) are denied. Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Appointment of Expert Witness to Assist/Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (Doc. 39) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/23/2015.(KMG)
July 8, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an init ial partial filing fee of $7.49. The claims against Defendant Mahler in Count Two are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Jane Doe Ryan, Jane Doe Pratt, Jane Doe Tucker, and Arizona Department of Corrections are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Ryan, Pratt, Wexford, Merchant, and Mahler must answer Count One of the Complaint and Defendants Ryan, Pratt, Corizon, and Tucker must answer Count Two of the Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Ryan, Pratt, Wexford, Merchant, Mahler, Corizon, and Tucker. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. The referral judge on this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade. All future filings must be captioned: CV 14-0402-PHX-DGC (BSB). This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/8/2014. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benge v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Joseph Benge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Incorporated of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Sources of Brentwood, TN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Mahlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?