Bottom Line Recoveries LLC v. Lockheed Martin Corporation

Plaintiff: Bottom Line Recoveries LLC
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Case Number: 2:2014cv00443
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Claim for Relief (Unjust Enrichment) of Complaint. (See attached Order). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/4/2014.(TLB)
August 22, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The parties wishing to present their request for a protective order to the Court, ORDERED setting In-Court Hearing on the parties' request for a protective order for 8/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Pho enix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A Teilborg. Counsel for both parties shall appear in person; no telephonic appearances will be permitted. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall on or before 8/26/2014 jointly e-mail to the Court a brief, no t to exceed ten (10) pages that (1) describes the documents or groups in a way such that the Court can understnad why they deserve protection and (2) as to each document or group of documents, articulates the specific harm or prejudice that will result if a protective order is not granted. In addition, the parties may include legal argument as necessary. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/22/2014. (TLB)
May 6, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - On May 6, 2014, Plaintiff filed an amended complaint. The Court finds the amended complaint alleges subject matter jurisdiction. As a result, the Court will take no further action regarding jurisdiction without prejudice to Defendant raisin g any jurisdictional issue it deems appropriate. As a result of the amended complaint having been filed, ORDERED that the 16 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims is denied without prejudice as moot. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint within 20 days. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/6/2014.(TLB)
April 22, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that by May 7, 2014, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the complaint properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/22/2014. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bottom Line Recoveries LLC v. Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Bruce R Heurlin
Represented By: Catherine North Hounfodji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bottom Line Recoveries LLC
Represented By: Trevor G Bartel
Represented By: Jaclyn K Casey
Represented By: Kristina Novotny Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?