United States of America v. Bigley et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Michael A Bigley, Carolyn E Bigley, Robert B Kelso, Raeola D Kelso and ISA Ministries
Case Number: 2:2014cv00729
Filed: April 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Kelso Defendants' Motion for Disqualification of Chief Judge Murry Snow (Doc. 324 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Kelso Defendants' 2nd Motion for Relief from Order (Doc. 320 ) is denied and this case is referred back to Judge Holland for ruling on the pending motions (Docs. 318 , 319 , 322 ) and (Doc. 325 ) recently filed. (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/23/19. (SLQ)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER denying 287 Motion to Strike. The Clerk shall disburse the $107,329.08 remaining in the court registry, along with accrued interest, if any, in accordance with the instructions set forth in the Notice of Levy. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 8/20/19. (DXD)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER - Plaintiff's 267 Motion for Disbursement of the funds remaining in the Court Registry is denied. The Bigley defendants' 269 counterclaim is denied. The Bigley defendants' 268 Motion to Compel is denied as moot. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 7/2/18. (GMP)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER denying 231 and 232 Motions to Disqualify Judge. The Motions for Reconsideration contained in those documents are referred back to Judge Holland for further ruling. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/10/17.(DXD)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying 175 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. See document for details. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 11/21/2016. (ATD)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying 123 and 124 Defendant Michael A. Bigley's Requests to Take Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 12/18/15. (EJA)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 88 KLA-Tencor's motion to dismiss as to the Bigley May 27, 2015, third-party complaint (see attached PDF for further details). Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 7/31/2015. (ACL)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 37 Bigley defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 2/27/2015. (ACL)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER the Bigleys' 21 and Kelsos' 20 Motions to Dismiss are denied. The 26 Motion for a Protective Order and Motion for Joinder are denied. The 27 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions is denied. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 12/3/2014.(LFIG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bigley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Nelson
Represented By: Nithya Senra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Bigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn E Bigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raeola D Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISA Ministries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?