Western Alliance Bank v. Jefferson

Plaintiff: Western Alliance Bank
Defendant: Richard Jefferson
Case Number: 2:2014cv00761
Filed: April 11, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2016 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 313 Motion for Protective Order; denying 316 Motion to Quash; granting 322 Motion to Amend/Correct. See PDF. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/13/16.(JWS)
August 30, 2016 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 291 Motion for Reconsideration of the court's order at docket 286, which resolved the motion in limine at docket 270. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/30/16.(JWS)
May 3, 2016 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 267 Motion in Limine re: Exclusion of All Reference to And Evidence Regarding FBI Investigation; granting in part and denying in part 269 Motion in Limine re: Exclusion of Expert Testimony of William Flynn and any Evidence of Forged Documents; granting in part and denying in part 270 Motion in Limine re: Exclusion of Unpleaded Damages and Damages Analysis. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 5/3/16.(JWS)
April 8, 2016 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 248 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Alliance's application for attorney's fees and non-taxable expenses at docket 248 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Alliance is awarded a total of $291,990.84 in attorney's fees, costs, and expenses. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 4/8/16.(JWS)
November 13, 2015 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Kritza's motion at docket 127 is DENIED. Jefferson's motion at docket 129 is DENIED. Alliance's motion at docket 131 is GRANTED. Kritza's motion at docket 132 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: Kri tza is GRANTED summary judgment on counts one, three, five, nine, and ten; Kritza is GRANTED summary judgment on counts two, four, and eight to the extent those claims seek damages based on the approval, extension, or amendment of the Alliance LOC; and in all other respects the motion at docket 132 is DENIED. Jefferson's request for Rule 56(d) relief at docket 162 is DENIED. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/13/15.(SJF)
October 7, 2015 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Jefferson's motion to strike at docket 182 is GRANTED; Alliance's filing at docket 177 is hereby stricken. Further, the court will consider or disregard Jefferson's filing at docket 166 consistent with the authority discussed above. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 10/7/15.(KGM)
September 30, 2015 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Kritza's motion at docket 210 is GRANTED. Jefferson's motion to strike at docket 218 is DENIED, and Jefferson's motion for leave to file a surresponse and controverting statement of facts at docket 218 is GRANTED. Kritza shall file his proposed supplemental statement of facts within two days. (See document for details.) Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 09/30/15. (ATD)
August 18, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 154 Motion to Declare Errata Sheet to Theodore Kritza's Deposition Timely Submitted to Court Reporter. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/18/15.(JWS)
August 17, 2015 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 149 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/17/15.(JWS)
August 7, 2015 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting 113 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff may not call James Tucciarone to offer opinion testimony. If he is called as a lay witness, any testimony which purports to summarize documents or events must be strictly limited to lay testimony and may not be used as a back door through which opinion testimony is elicited. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/6/15.(LSP)
July 24, 2015 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION, Kritza's motion 81 is denied; Jefferson's motions 96 are denied; Jefferson is ordered to supplement his Rule 26 disclosures within 21 days to bring them in compliance with the standards identified in this order. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/23/15.(REW)
July 1, 2015 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/1/15.(JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Alliance Bank v. Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Jefferson
Represented By: Charles Norman Bahlert(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David Albrecht Fitzgerald(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Thomas P Mazzucco(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Aaron K McClellan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Bryan LP Saalfeld(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Alliance Bank
Represented By: John R Clemency(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Janel Marie Glynn(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?