National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford et al v. James River Insurance

Plaintiff: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford and Sigma Contracting Incorporated
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00765
Filed: April 11, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, (Doc. 54 ), of the Court's February 16, 2016, Order granting in part and denying in part summary judgment, (Doc. 51 ), is hereby DENIED; however, the Order, (Doc. 51 ), is clarified to the extent specified above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial date and related hearings and deadlines are confirmed. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/6/2016. (KAL)
February 16, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, (Doc. 42 ), with respect to the issue of James River's duty to defend Sigma as an additional insured is GRANTED, and James River's motion for summary judgment, (Doc . 38 ), on the issue is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, (Doc. 42 ), with respect to the issue of James River's duty to indemnify Sigma as an additional insured is DENIED, and James River's motion for summary judgment, (Doc. 38 ), on the issue is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgement, (Doc. 42 ), with respect to the issue of equitable contribution is DENIED. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/16/16. (LAD)
April 23, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - By 5/7/2014, Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/23/2014. (TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford et al v. James River Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Molly Catherine Machold
Represented By: Timothy I McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigma Contracting Incorporated
Represented By: Molly Catherine Machold
Represented By: Timothy I McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?