CIT Finance LLC v. Treon, Aguirre, Newman & Norris PA

Plaintiff: CIT Finance LLC
Defendant: Treon, Aguirre, Newman & Norris PA
Case Number: 2:2014cv00800
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2017 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting Defendants Pacific Office Automation, Inc., Darin DuMolin, and Derek Abert's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees. 117 ; Defendants Pacific Office Automation, Inc., Darin DuMolin, and Derek Abert are awarded reasonable attorneys' fees in this matter in the sum of $35,126.77. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/16/17. (REW)
November 9, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Third- Party Defendants Pacific Office Automation, Inc., Darin DuMolin, and Derek Abert, and against Third-Party Plaintiff Treon, Aguirre, Newman & Norris PA. Because these are the only remaining parties, the Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/8/16.(KGM)
May 20, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join Indispensable Parties. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/20/2015.(TLB)
May 2, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court has reviewed the two supplements to the complaint and finds jurisdiction to have been alleged. Accordingly, the Court will take no further action regarding jurisdiction at this time. This Order is without prejudice to Defendant raising any jurisdictional issue it deems appropriate. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify this Court within 24 hours if it discovers that any of its jurisdictional allegations were incorrect. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/2/2014. (TLB)
April 29, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff has not alleged the citizenship of the professional association Defendant. More specifically, Defendant must allege whether it is a partnership, and if yes, the citizenship of each of the partners. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that b y 5/13/2014, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the complaint properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/29/2014. (TLB)
April 22, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the complaint by 5/7/2014 properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/22/2014. (TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CIT Finance LLC v. Treon, Aguirre, Newman & Norris PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIT Finance LLC
Represented By: David N Ingrassia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treon, Aguirre, Newman & Norris PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?