Berrey v. Plaintiff Investment Funding LLC et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Berrey
Defendant: Plaintiff Investment Funding LLC, Dignity Health Incorporated, Scottsdale Healthcare Corporation and Injury Assistance LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00847
Filed: April 22, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Bridget S Bade
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court lifts its Order (Doc. 89 ) holding the cross motions for summary judgment in abeyance pending supplemental briefing on portions of 66 Berrey's motion for summary judgment and 72 Injury Assistance's cross motion f or summary judgment. The Court GRANTS 66 Berrey's motion for summary judgment on Injury Assistance's affirmative defense that it has statutory lien rights to Berrey's settlement proceeds and DENIES 72 Injury Assistance's cro ss motion on its affirmative defense that it has statutory lien rights to Berrey's settlement proceeds. The Clerk shall terminate the motions. See PDF document for further details. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk will disburse the remaining funds deposited in the Court's registry, $12,950.02 with any accrued interest, payable to Andrew Berrey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 8/28/15. (LSP)
May 8, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Berrey's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Berrey's First Supplement to His Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (Doc. 85 ) is stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 5/8/15.(LSP)
May 5, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: the Court strikes Sections III through V in PIF's brief ( 95 at 3-7) and will not consider the arguments in those sections. FURTHER ORDERED that by 5/18/15, Berrey and PIF must show cause why the Court should not dismiss PIF's i nterpleader claims for failure to comply with the Court's 3/30/15 Order, and thus dismiss this matter for lack of jurisdiction. Berrey's and PIF's responses must include copies of PIF's loan agreements with Berrey and must address those agreements. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 5/4/15. (SJF)
April 14, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the 92 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 4/14/2015.(LFIG)
April 10, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Injury Assistant's 79 Motion to Disgorge Michael Love's Attorney's Fees, construed as a Motion for Relief from a Judgment or Order, is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 4/10/2015.(LFIG)
March 30, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Berrey and Injury Assistance must submit additional briefing as set forth in this Order. ORDERED that no later than April 20, 2015 Berrey and Injury Assistance must exchange, but not file, their supplemental briefs. ORDERED after reviewing the opposing briefs, the parties shall file their supplemental briefs with the Court no later than April 27, 2015. ORDERED holding in abeyance part of Berrey's 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment. ORDERED that Berrey's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment on Injury Assistance's counter claim asserting contractual lien rights is GRANTED. ORDERED that Berrey's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment on Injury Assistance's counter c laim for breach of contract is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Injury Assistance's 72 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. ORDERED no later April 20, 2015 Berrey and PIF must exchange their briefs on the issues as set forth in this Order. ORDERED after reviewing the opposing briefs, the parties shall file their briefs with the Court no later than April 27, 2015. After Berrey and PIF file their briefs on the issues, Injury Assistance and Scottsdale Health Care may file briefs responding to Berrey's and PIF's briefs by no later than May 4, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 3/30/2015. (LFIG)
December 9, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Injury Assitance's 51 Motion to Compel is DENIED. Elardo Firm and Electric's 60 Motion for Attorneys' Fees is DENIED. ORDERED that Injury Assistance, the Elardo firm, and Electric must meet and confer to continue their attempts to resolve this dispute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that neither Injury Assistance nor the non-parties may file any additional motions related to this discovery dispute without contacting the Court to request a telephonic conference to discuss any remaining disputed issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 12/9/2014.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrey v. Plaintiff Investment Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Berrey
Represented By: Michael Spencer Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiff Investment Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B Burnham
Represented By: Jeremy Thomas Poryes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Injury Assistance LLC
Represented By: George Everett Griffeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?