White v. Aurora Loan Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Shizue S White
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2014cv01021
Filed: May 12, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 78 is granted; Plaintiff's Response/Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 81 is denied; the 6/12/14 Preliminary Injunction 29 is hereby dissolved; Defendants are no longer enjoined from condu cting a Trustee's Sale of the residence at 11126 Nocturne Court, Sun City, Arizona 85351; the bond is exonerated; the Clerk shall terminate this case and enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/5/16. (REW)
April 7, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 63 Consent Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in the form attached to her motion on or before Monday, April 13, 2015. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/7/15.(CLB)
March 31, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants' Motion to Join an Indispensable Party, or, in the alternative, for Permissive Joinder of a Non-Party Defendant 46 is denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/31/15.(REW)
October 9, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Motion to Dismiss 13 is granted in part and denied in part; it is granted at to Count 3 and denied as to all other Counts. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/8/14.(REW)
June 12, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing on 6/11/2014, ORDERED that 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. Defendants (in all their capacities) are enjoined from conducting a Trustees Sale of the residence at 11126 Nocturne Court, Sun City, AZ 85351, until this injunction is dissolved by this Court, conditioned on Plaintiff posting a bond of $1.00 by Monday, 7/16/2014. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/11/2014. (TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Aurora Loan Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shizue S White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Stephen M Dichter
Represented By: Lon Haley Johnson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Stephen M Dichter
Represented By: Lon Haley Johnson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?