Eftenoff v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Brian Thomas Eftenoff
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2014cv01023
Filed: May 12, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 47 is accepted; the Clerk shall enter judgment denying and dismissing Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. & #167; 2254 1 with prejudice; the Clerk shall terminate this action; a Certificate of Appealability is denied because dismissal of the Petition is justified by a plain procedural bar (Petitioners Claims 4a, 4c, 7a), procedural default (Claim 8b), or lack of a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right (Claims 7d, 8a) upon which reasonable jurists would disagree. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/25/16. (REW)
November 30, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that Petitioner's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED and DISMISSED with prejudice. The parties shall have fourteen days from the date of service of a copy of this recommendation within whic h to file specific written objections with the Court. Failure to timely file objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation may result in the acceptance of the Report and Recommendation by the district court without further review. (See document for full details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 11/30/2015. (ATD)
April 28, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. 35 ) is accepted. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Stay and Abey Habeas Proceedings (Doc. 25 ) is denied. This matter remains referred to Magistrate Judge Burns. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 4/28/15. (NKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eftenoff v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Thomas Eftenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?