Eldridge #147718 v. Schroeder

Plaintiff: Joseph Gerald Lee Eldridge
Defendant: JD Schroeder
Case Number: 2:2014cv01325
Filed: June 13, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS ORDERED that the R&R (Doc. 58 ) is accepted. The motion for permission and court order to service by ad in USA Today (Doc. 54 ), request of the court (Doc. 57 ), and objection to document 50 (Doc. 56 ) are denied. A certificate of appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/11/16. (KGM)
January 28, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED denying "Motion for Permission and Court Ordered to Service by Ad in 'USA Today.'" (Doc. 54 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying "Request of the Court." (Doc. 57 ). IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Court dismiss without prejudice "Complaint for Negligence." (Doc. 21 ). (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/28/16. (LAD)
December 4, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Time for Service of Defendant JD Schroeder (Doc. 47 ); that Plaintiff show cause no later than January 6, 2016 why his case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely serve pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P.; denying Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery (Doc. 46 ); granting in part Objection to and Motion to Quash Subpoenas (Doc. 41 ). The subpoena duces tecum to the Governor of Arizona is quas hed, and the objection to it is sustained. The objection to the subpoena duces tecum served upon the Arizona Department of Corrections is sustained in part. However, the Arizona Department of Corrections is required to disclose to the Court under s eal any document reflecting the current location of Defendant J. D. Schroeder for purposes of service of process by the USMS. Production of further documents requested is deemed unduly burdensome. The additional documents are irrelevant, and the sc ope of the subpoena duces tecum is overly broad. To the extent the subpoena duces tecum seeks records other than the current location of Defendant Schroeder, it is quashed; the "Letter to the Court" (Doc. 39 ) is deemed moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 12/04/2015. (REK)
December 2, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for the Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 40 ) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 12/02/2015. (REK)
June 29, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's appeal of the Magistrate Judge's April 23, 2015 order is denied. See document for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 06/29/15. (ATD)
April 23, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Service of Plaintiff's original Complaint (Doc. 1 ) is stayed. The Clerk of the Court shall forward copies of this Order to the United States Marshals Service. The United States Marshal shall retain the Summons, a copy of the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 21 ), and a copy of this Order for future use. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 24 ) is denied. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/22/15. (LAD)
October 3, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's June 26, 2014 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 8 is denied without prejudice; Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees or file a comp lete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement; If Plaintiff fails to either pay or file a complete Application within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action wi thout prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff; Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order 9 is denied without prejudice; The Clerk of the Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/3/2014. (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eldridge #147718 v. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gerald Lee Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?