Folta #153847 v. Van Winkle et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Michael Folta
Defendant: Jeffrey Van Winkle
Case Number: 2:2014cv01562
Filed: July 10, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2016 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's November 1, 2016 Motion (Doc. 152 ) and directing the Clerk of Court to withdraw Plaintiff's "Motion: Injunctive Relief (TRO against CIU/SIG investigator Pruitt)" (Doc. 151 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 11/3/16. (KGM)
July 28, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part and granting in part 111 Defendants Contreras and Burke's "Motion for Reconsideration of a Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order (DKT. 103 )." ORDERED affirming the Court's April 4, 2016 Order (Doc. 103 ), ex cept that Defendants may present for an in camera inspection proposed redactions of the following information from the documents required to be produced: (i) employees' first names and (ii) any other security-sensitive information, provided that the proposed redactions are made in such a way that they do not materially impede Plaintiff's ability to decipher relevant information contained in the documents. ORDERED that unless Defendants file an objection to the Order (Doc. 103 ) with the District Judge, Defendants shall produce for an in camera inspection an unredacted and a proposed redacted version of the documents no later than fourteen days after this Order is filed. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to strike Plaintiff's May 2, 2016 filing, docketed as "Response to Motion for Reconsideration" (Doc. 117 ). See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 7/27/16.(EJA)
January 14, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' "Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Service by Publication (Doc. 61)" (Doc. 65 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's "Motion for Service by Publication as to Defen dant Richard Basso" (Doc. 61 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendants' "Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendant Basso's Home Address" (Doc. 67 ). Defendants shall file under seal the home address of Defendant Basso by J anuary 19, 2016. Upon receipt of the address, the Clerk of Court shall prepare and send to the U.S. Marshal a service packet for service of the Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Basso. The time for completing service is extended sixty days from th e date this Order is filed. FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendants' "Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Filings (DKTS. 8, 9, 14, and 17)" (Doc. 75 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to strike the documents docketed as Document Nos. 8 , [9 ], 14 , and 17 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendants' "Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. 60)" (Doc. 64 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's "Motion to Compe l Production of Documents" (Doc. 76 ) as set forth herein. By February 16, 2016, counsel for Defendants shall produce any and all disciplinary history pertaining to Defendant CO II Burke. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that "Motion for Default Judgement [sic] Against Dustin Burke" (Doc. 62 ) is referred to the District Court Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/13/2016.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Folta #153847 v. Van Winkle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Van Winkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Michael Folta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?