December 27, 2016 |
Filing
239
ORDER that Plaintiff's appeal (Doc. 238 ) is DENIED, and the Magistrate Judge's Order (Doc. 237 ) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/27/16. (KGM)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
220
ORDER that Plaintiff's appeal, (Doc. 219 ), is DENIED, and the Magistrate Judge's August 8, 2016 Order, (Doc. 198 ), is AFFIRMED. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/18/2016. (KMG)
|
June 16, 2016 |
Filing
184
ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn only with respect to Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, (Doc. 175 , 180 , 183 ), and Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling on Entire Case, (Doc. 182 ), and th at all other matters must remain with the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, (Doc. 150 ), is ACCEPTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, (Doc. 143 ), is GRANTED . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Officer Watzek A8993 and Provider Erika Saretsky, PA are DISMISSED, from this action with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Count Two of the TAC is DISMISSED, without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Count Twelve of the TAC is DISMISSED,without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the claims for damages against Defendants Medical Director Jeffrey Alvarez, Medical Pamela Brooks, Medical Supervisor Teressa DeMille, and External Referees B. Piirinen and Scott Frye are DISM ISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, (Doc. 146 ), is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, (Doc. 147 ), is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File anAmended Complaint, (Doc. 175 ), is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, (Doc. 180 ), is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling on Entire Case, (Doc. 182 ), is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, (Doc. 183 ), is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/15/2016. (KMG)
|
November 2, 2015 |
Filing
133
ORDER denying 109 Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/30/2015.(TLB)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
93
ORDER denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration ; FURTHER ORDERED denying 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration ; FURTHER ORDERED denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/11/2015.(TLB)
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
64
*ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 37 ) is ACCEPTED AS MODIFIED above. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Leave to Amend (Doc. 23 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Counts One, Three, Five, Eight, Te n, Eleven, Thirteen, Fifteen, and Seventeen are dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Maricopa County Correctional Health Services is dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the claims for damages against Defendants "J ohn Doe 2," "John Doe 4," "John Doe 5," B. Piirinen, and Scott Frye are dismissed with prejudice (claims for injunctive relief remain.) FURTHER ORDERED that Count Four is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t Plaintiff be allowed to participate in discovery to determine the identities of Defendants "[M]edical [N]urse [M]ary," "Officer A8845," John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, John Doe 10, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, and thereafter be allowed to attempt service on these Defendants. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/29/2015. (KMG) *Modified to correct text on 6/30/2015 (KMG).
|