Premier Funding Group LLC v. Aviva Life and Annuity Company et al

Plaintiff: Premier Funding Group LLC
Defendant: Aviva Life and Annuity Company, Crump Life Insurance Services Incorporated, Richard Baldwin, Unknown Baldwin, Nick Larson, Ashley Larsen, Tony Lengeling, Kari Lengeling and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2014cv01633
Filed: July 18, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/25/2015.(DGC, nvo)
December 8, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/8/2014.(DGC, nvo)
October 27, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re burden of proof. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/27/2014. (DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier Funding Group LLC v. Aviva Life and Annuity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Funding Group LLC
Represented By: Matthew Alan Lensch(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Louis Daniel Lopez, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviva Life and Annuity Company
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John T Clendenin(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jason M Porter(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crump Life Insurance Services Incorporated
Represented By: Alan M Kidd(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sal James Rivera(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Baldwin
Represented By: Sean Patrick Healy(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Adam S Polson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Larson
Represented By: Alan M Kidd(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sal James Rivera(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Larsen
Represented By: Alan M Kidd(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sal James Rivera(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Lengeling
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John T Clendenin(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jason M Porter(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Lengeling
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John T Clendenin(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jason M Porter(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?