Edwards v. Mesa Municipal Court et al

Plaintiff: Corey Darnell Edwards
Defendant: Mesa Municipal Court, Chandler Police Department, Mesa Police Department and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 2:2014cv01676
Filed: July 25, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Doc. 18 ) is denied. Plaintiff's motion for management conference (Doc. 17 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall not file motions or other documents in this dismissed action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/19/2015.(REK)
January 28, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. This action is dismissed without prejudice. 2. The Clerk is directed enter judgment accordingly and terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/15. (LAD)
November 18, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. The City's motion for a more definite statement (Doc. 4 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that follows the guidance in this order on or before December 22, 2014. 2. The County Defendants' motion to dismis s (Doc. 5 ) is granted. The state law claims against the County Defendants and the § 1983 claims against MCSO are dismissed with prejudice. 3. Plaintiff's pending motions (Docs. 9 , 10 ) are denied as moot. 4. The Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for December 16, 2014 at 4:30 p.m. is vacated and will be reset if Plaintiff files an amended complaint on or before December 22, 2014. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/18/14. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Mesa Municipal Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Municipal Court
Represented By: Duncan Jeffrey Stoutner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Police Department
Represented By: Duncan Jeffrey Stoutner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: James W Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Darnell Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?