Robledo #250767 v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Paul Anthony Robledo
Defendant: Nicole Taylor and Corizon Health Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2014cv01864
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2017 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion to vacate (Doc. 207 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to vacate (Doc. 208 ) is denied. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the petition for writ (Doc. 214 ) is denied [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/8/17.(MAW)
February 27, 2017 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 89 Defendant Taylor's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants, Plaintiff shall take nothing. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/24/17.(LSP)
December 21, 2016 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's 193 Report and Recommendation is REJECTED.Thus, Defendant's pending Motion for Summary Judgment will be decided based on Defendant's 89 Motion and 90 Supporting Statement of Facts, Plaintiff� 39;s replacement 145 Response and 146 Supporting Statement of Facts, Defendant's 152 Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Defendant's 153 Objection to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts and Suppleme ntal Statement of Facts, Defendant's 157 Sealed Exhibits to the Supplemental Statement of Facts, and Plaintiff's 198 Controverting Statement of Facts to Defendant's Supplemental Statement of Facts. FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff's 168 Motion for an Extension of Time is DENIED as moot. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/21/2016. (ATD)
August 19, 2016 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 133 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/19/16.(KGM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robledo #250767 v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Anthony Robledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?