CrossFit Incorporated v. Martin et al

Plaintiff: CrossFit Incorporated
Defendant: Jeff Martin, Mikki Lee Martin and Brand X Martial Arts
Case Number: 2:2014cv02277
Filed: October 14, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2017 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 214 Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaim. FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part 216 Defendants and Counterclaimants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants Jeff Martin, Brand X Martial Arts, and CrossFit Brand X are entitled to summary judgment as to Plaintiff's breach of Contract claim (Count 1). The balance of Defendants' Motion is denied, and Plaintiff's remaining claims will proceed to trial. FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part [222 ] Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff CrossFit is not entitled to summary judgment on its claims, and they will proceed to trial as limited above. Counterdefendants CrossFit and Greg Glassman are entitled to summary judgment on Defendants' Counterclaims for breach of the 2009 License Agreement and the associated covenant of good faith and fair dealing (Counterclaims 5 and 6), for breach of the Transition Agreement and the associated covenant of good faith and fair d ealing only to the extent these counterclaims are brought by Brand X Martial Arts and CrossFit Brand X (Counterclaims 7 and 8), tortious interference (Counterclaims 9 and 10), and defamation (Counterclaim 11). The balance of Counterdefendants' Motion is denied, and Defendants' remaining claims (Counterclaims 7 and 8 as brought by the Martins) will proceed to trial. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING 235 renewed Motion for Sanctions. FURTHER ORDERED grating 231 , 233 Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/22/17.(MAP)
August 3, 2017 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying 230 Plaintiff CrossFit, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Carl Saba. (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/3/17.(JAMA)
May 15, 2017 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS ORDERED adopting the R&R (Doc. 193 ) in whole. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED limiting Defendants'/Counterclaimants' damages allegations at trial to those amounts they represented up to and including December 22, 2016. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/15/17. (SLQ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CrossFit Incorporated v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CrossFit Incorporated
Represented By: Christina G Bobb
Represented By: Steven J Cologne
Represented By: Trisha Dyan Farmer
Represented By: Matthew Paul Fischer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikki Lee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand X Martial Arts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?