Vroom v. Johnson

Plaintiff: Patricia M Vroom
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Case Number: 2:2014cv02463
Filed: November 6, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Joint Motion for Protective Order. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/10/2015.(TLB)
June 3, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to File 2.5 Page Surreply. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/3/2015.(TLB)
March 5, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Order at Doc. 7 is stricken. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Relief from Standing Order for Certain Employment Cases (Doc. 26 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/5/2015.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vroom v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia M Vroom
Represented By: Bradley Hugh Schleier(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Tod F Schleier(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?